Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2404575

EP2404575 - Posterior stabilized knee prosthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.08.2013
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
New York Society For The Ruptured And Crippled Maintaining The Hospital For Special Surgery
535 East 70th Street
New York, NY 10021 / US
[2012/02]
Inventor(s)01 / LIPMAN, Joseph
165 W 91st Street, Apt.7G
New York, NY New York 10024 / US
02 / Rabinowitz, Anna
535 East 70th Street
New York, NY New York 10021 / US
 [2012/02]
Representative(s)Zacco Denmark A/S
Arne Jacobsens Allé 15
2300 Copenhagen S / DK
[N/P]
Former [2013/03]Zacco Denmark A/S
Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
Former [2012/02]Wollny, Inga Marie
Zacco Denmark A/S
Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
Application number, filing date11178587.925.09.2007
[2012/02]
Priority number, dateUS20060826844P25.09.2006         Original published format: US 826844 P
[2012/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2404575
Date:11.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2404575
Date:24.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/38
[2012/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/02]
Extension statesAL24.08.2011
BA24.08.2011
HR24.08.2011
MK24.08.2011
RS24.08.2011
TitleGerman:Im Nachhinein stabilisierte Knieprothese[2012/02]
English:Posterior stabilized knee prosthesis[2012/02]
French:Prothèse postérieure stabilisée du genou[2012/02]
Examination procedure24.08.2011Examination requested  [2012/02]
19.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2012Fee for grant paid
21.08.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07814989.5  / EP2066266
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070814989) is  30.01.2012
Opposition(s)25.07.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
24.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
24.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.09.2007
AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
MT24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
TR24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
MT24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
TR24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2014/36]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2014/20]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/52]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/37]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/35]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/34]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/31]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/28]BE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/26]BE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
Former [2013/24]BE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
Former [2013/23]FI24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
IS24.02.2013
Former [2013/22]FI24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
IS24.02.2013
Former [2013/21]SE24.10.2012
Documents cited:Search[X]US5639279  (BURKINSHAW BRIAN D [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-13,15,16 * column 7, line 25 - line 58 * * column 8, line 27 - column 9, line 18 * * figures 2C,3A,3B,4,12A-12F *;
 [X]US3840905  (DEANE G) [X] 1-15 * column 2, line 62 - column 4, line 25 * * figures 1-8 *;
 [X]US6039764  (POTTENGER LAWRENCE A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,10-13,15 * column 19, line 46 - column 20, line 32 * * figures 34-37,45 *;
 [X]FR2844704  (BIOMET MERCK FRANCE [FR], et al) [X] 1,3,7,10,12,15 * page 4, line 1 - line 3 * * page 5, line 12 - line 36 * * figures 11-15 *
by applicantUS4209861
 US4298992
 US4213209
 US4888021