EP2565445 - Transformer chamber for a wind turbine, wind turbine structure component, wind turbine, and method for assembling a wind turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.04.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gaard, Jesper Birkebakken 30 5260 Odense S / DK | 02 /
Munk-Hansen, Thorkil Sondervang 200 7323 Give / DK | 03 /
Nielsen, Jacob Blach Kastanie alle 37 7442 Engesvang / DK | 04 /
Wang, Alex Yundong Haraldsgade 9b 7400 Herning / DK | [2013/10] | Application number, filing date | 11179874.0 | 02.09.2011 | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2565445 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2565445 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F03D11/00, H01F27/02, H01F27/12 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
H01F27/025 (EP,US);
F03D80/82 (EP,US);
H01F27/06 (US);
H01F27/085 (US);
H01F27/12 (EP,US);
H01F27/321 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Title | German: | Wandlerkammer für eine Windturbine, Windturbinenstrukturkomponente, Windturbine und Verfahren zur Montage einer Windturbine | [2013/10] | English: | Transformer chamber for a wind turbine, wind turbine structure component, wind turbine, and method for assembling a wind turbine | [2013/10] | French: | Chambre de transformateur pour éolienne, composant de structure d'éolienne, éolienne et procédé d'assemblage d'éolienne | [2013/10] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 11.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.11.2014
ADMISSIBLE SENVION SE Überseering 10 22297 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Seemann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Raboisen 6 20095 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.11.2014
ADMISSIBLE SENVION SE Überseering 10 22297 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Seemann & Partner Raboisen 6 20095 Hamburg / DE | 09.01.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.07.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.01.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.01.2017 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/30] | 06.03.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.09.2011 | AL | 26.02.2014 | AT | 26.02.2014 | BE | 26.02.2014 | BG | 26.02.2014 | CY | 26.02.2014 | CZ | 26.02.2014 | EE | 26.02.2014 | ES | 26.02.2014 | FI | 26.02.2014 | HR | 26.02.2014 | IT | 26.02.2014 | LT | 26.02.2014 | LV | 26.02.2014 | MC | 26.02.2014 | MT | 26.02.2014 | NL | 26.02.2014 | PL | 26.02.2014 | RO | 26.02.2014 | RS | 26.02.2014 | SE | 26.02.2014 | SI | 26.02.2014 | SK | 26.02.2014 | SM | 26.02.2014 | TR | 26.02.2014 | NO | 26.05.2014 | GR | 27.05.2014 | IS | 26.06.2014 | PT | 26.06.2014 | IE | 02.09.2014 | LU | 02.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 02.09.2011 | |
AT | 26.02.2014 | ||
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
RS | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
TR | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
IE | 02.09.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 02.09.2011 | |
AT | 26.02.2014 | ||
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
RS | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
IE | 02.09.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
RS | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
IE | 02.09.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
IE | 02.09.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
IE | 02.09.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
IE | 02.09.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/42] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 26.02.2014 | |
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2005103489 (NORTHERN POWER SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8-10,13-15 * page 2, lines 13-18 * * page 3, line 24 - page 5, line 24 * [Y] 4 [I] 5; | [XYI]EP2151833 (STARKSTROM GERAETEBAU GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6,7,9-13,15 * page 2, paragraph 5 * * column 3, paragraphs 22,23 * * page 4, paragraphs 47-54 * [Y] 4 [I] 5; | [XY]US2007013193 (GALLOWAY DUDLEY L [US], et al) [X] 1,9,10 * page 2, paragraphs 21,22 * * claims 24,32 * [Y] 4; | [X]EP2109206 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,6,13,15 * page 1, paragraph 13 * * page 2, paragraphs 23-29 *; | [Y]EP2063119 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 4 * page 3, paragraph 21 * * page 3, paragraph 27 - page 4, paragraph 30 *; | [A]GB1387942 (TRANSFORMATOREN UNION AG [DE]) [A] 5 * page 1, line 65 - page 2, line 10 *; | [A]EP0447389 (ELEKTRO BAU AG [AT]) [A] 5 * column 4, line 24 - column 5, line 25 *; | [A]WO2010069315 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK], et al) [A] 8,14 * abstract * * page 9, lines 1-14 * | Opposition | - "Pauwels SLIM transformer goes offshore", Newsletter Power der Pauwels Group, (20030000), vol. 2, no. 3, pages 1 - 16, XP055343022 |