blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2437153

EP2437153 - Apparatus and method for turning e-book pages in portable terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.08.2017
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  11.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.09.2017  [2017/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2012/39]
Former [2012/14]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Sung-Min
3F Bongcheon 6-dong 30-2
Gwanak-gu
Seoul / KR
02 / Lee, Dal-Kwang
No 401-503 Gangnam Maeul Summit Ville
Gugal-dong
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2012/14]
Representative(s)HGF
HGF Limited
Mill House
North Street
York YO1 6JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/14]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
Harrison Goddard Foote
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York, YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date11180099.105.09.2011
[2012/14]
Priority number, dateKR2010009581501.10.2010         Original published format: KR 20100095815
KR2011000861028.01.2011         Original published format: KR 20110008610
[2012/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2437153
Date:04.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2437153
Date:05.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.2016
ClassificationIPC:G06F3/048, // G06F1/16
[2016/40]
CPC:
G06F3/0483 (EP,US); G06F3/04883 (EP,US); G06F3/04886 (EP,US);
G06F1/1694 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2012/14]G06F3/048
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/14]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Blättern von e-Book-Seiten in einem tragbaren Endgerät[2012/14]
English:Apparatus and method for turning e-book pages in portable terminal[2012/14]
French:Appareil et procédé pour tourner des pages de livre électronique (e-book) dans un terminal portable[2012/14]
Examination procedure06.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/39]
12.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2017/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
05.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
07.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
26.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]US5463725  (HENCKEL JONATHAN D [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [I]EP2104026  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0115]; figures 1-5,7 *;
 [I]US2010045616  (LI XIAO-GUANG [CN], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0036]; figures 4-5 *;
 [A]CN101794191  (JIAYAN WANG) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 *;
 [A]US6300933  (NAGASAKI KATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 3,7,11,15 * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]WO2009128593  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 3,7,11,15 * paragraphs [0045] , [0049] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1-2 *;
 [A]US2006277478  (SERAJI SEANA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6448986  (SMITH KIM C [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 6, line 56 - column 9, line 11; figures 1-3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.