Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2420838

EP2420838 - An in vitro method for the prognosis of progression of a cancer and of the outcome in a patient and means for performing said method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.03.2014
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2018Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 23.01.2019  [2019/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale)
101, rue de Tolbiac
75013 Paris / FR
[2012/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Galon, Jérôme
Centre Biomédical des Cordeliers
15 rue de l'Ecole de Médecine
Bâtiment E
75270 PARIS Cedex 06 / FR
02 / Pages, Franck
Centre Biomédical des Cordeliers
15 rue de l'Ecole de Médecine
Bâtiment E
75270 PARIS Cedex 06 / FR
03 / Fridman, Wolf-Herman
Centre Biomédical des Cordeliers
15 rue de l'Ecole de Médecine
Bâtiment E
75270 PARIS Cedex 06 / FR
 [2012/08]
Representative(s)Chajmowicz, Marion
Becker & Associés
25, rue Louis Le Grand
75002 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/08]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date11180207.028.09.2006
[2012/08]
Priority number, dateUS20060764356P02.02.2006         Original published format: US 764356 P
EP2005029220019.10.2005         Original published format: EP 05292200
[2012/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2420838
Date:22.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2420838
Date:26.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2420838
Date:16.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.08.2012
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/574
[2012/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/08]
TitleGerman:In-vitro-Verfahren zur Prognose einer Tumorprogression und des Ergebnisses bei einem Patienten sowie Mittel zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens[2012/08]
English:An in vitro method for the prognosis of progression of a cancer and of the outcome in a patient and means for performing said method[2012/08]
French:Procédé in-vitro pour le pronostic de la progression d'un cancer et du résultat thérapeutique et moyens pour réaliser ce procédé[2012/08]
Examination procedure26.03.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/18]
03.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2014Fee for grant paid
06.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06809203.0  / EP1943520
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.01.2015  21.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Ventana Medical Systems, Inc.
1910 Innovation Park Dr.
Tucson, AZ 85755 / US
Opponent's representative
Mewburn Ellis LLP, et al
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
 [2019/04]
Former [2015/09]
Opponent(s)01  14.01.2015  21.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Ventana Medical Systems, Inc.
1910 Innovation Park Dr.
Tucson, AZ 85755 / US
Opponent's representative
Jones, Rachel Ann, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
33 Gutter Lane
London EC2V 8AS / GB
24.02.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.04.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.07.2016Date of oral proceedings
14.11.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.11.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition12.01.2017Appeal received No.  T2744/16
24.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
22.12.2016Appeal received No.  T2744/16
23.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
06.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
06.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
06.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
24.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
23.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.09.2006
AT16.04.2014
BE16.04.2014
CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SI16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
TR16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU28.09.2006
AT16.04.2014
BE16.04.2014
CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SI16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
Former [2015/36]AT16.04.2014
BE16.04.2014
CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SI16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
Former [2015/11]AT16.04.2014
BE16.04.2014
CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
Former [2015/10]AT16.04.2014
BE16.04.2014
CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
Former [2015/08]AT16.04.2014
BE16.04.2014
CY16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
Former [2015/02]AT16.04.2014
CY16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
Former [2014/51]AT16.04.2014
CY16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
Former [2014/50]CY16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
Former [2014/49]CY16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
Former [2014/48]CY16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
Former [2014/47]CY16.04.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]  - NAGTEGAAL IRIS D ET AL, "Local and distant recurrences in rectal cancer patients are predicted by the nonspecific immune response; specific immune response has only a systemic effect - a histopathological and immunohistochemical study", BMC CANCER, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20010716), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1471-2407-1-7, ISSN 1471-2407, page 7, XP021016028 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * * See in particular: Abstract, materials and methods; Table I; p. 5, col. 2, Results, 1st paragraph; p. 6, col. 2, paragraphs 1-2; Table 5; Discussion. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2407-1-7
 [A]  - JOHNSON S K ET AL, "Immune cell infiltrates and prognosis in primary carcinoma of the lung", LUNG CANCER, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20000101), vol. 27, no. 1, ISSN 0169-5002, pages 27 - 35, XP002597875 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * * See in particular: Title; Abstract; materials and methods. *
 [A]  - RYSCHICH E ET AL, "Control of T-cell-mediated immune response by HLA class I in human pancreatic carcinoma", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20050115), vol. 11, no. 2 Pt 1, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 498 - 504, XP002597873 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * * See in particular: Abstract; materials and methods. *
 [A]  - JENNIFER K LOWNEY ET AL, "Interferon Regulatory Factor-1 and -2 Expression in Human Melanoma Specimens", ANNALS OF SURGICAL ONCOLOGY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NE, (19990901), vol. 6, no. 6, ISSN 1534-4681, pages 604 - 608, XP019369964 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * * In particular: Abstract; Table 2. *
 [A]  - ATSUO YOSHINO ET AL, "Therapeutic Implications of Interferon Regulatory Factor (IRF)-1 and IRF-2 in Diffusely Infiltrating Astrocytomas (DIA): Response to Interferon (IFN)-[beta] in Glioblastoma Cells and Prognostic Value for DIA", JOURNAL OF NEURO-ONCOLOGY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20050901), vol. 74, no. 3, ISSN 1573-7373, pages 249 - 260, XP019260745 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Fig. 4-6; Tables 1-3. *
 [A]  - DOHERTY G M ET AL, "Interferon regulatory factor expression in human breast cancer.", ANNALS OF SURGERY MAY 2001 LNKD- PUBMED:11323500, (200105), vol. 233, no. 5, ISSN 0003-4932, pages 623 - 629, XP055025327 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * * In particular: Abstract; Tables 1 and 2. *
 [A]  - MARTH C ET AL, "Interferon-gamma expression is an independent prognostic factor in ovarian cancer", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF OBSTETRICS & GYNECOLOGY, MOSBY, ST LOUIS, MO, US, (20041101), vol. 191, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.AJOG.2004.05.007, ISSN 0002-9378, pages 1598 - 1605, XP004642304 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * * In particular: Patients and methods section; Table III; Results section, 1st paragraph; Comment section; 2nd and 3rd paragraph. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ajog.2004.05.007
 [A]  - LOBO SHALINI C ET AL, "The immune environment in human endometrium during the window of implantation", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF REPRODUCTIVE IMMUNOLOGY, (200410), vol. 52, no. 4, ISSN 1046-7408, pages 244 - 251, XP055024422 [A] 1-3 * the whole document *
Examination   - "Distribution of lymphocytes of the aEb7 phenotype and E-cadherin in normal human urothelium and bladder carcinomas", (20010101), URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/store/10.1046/j.1365-2249.2001.01652.x/asset/j.1365-2249.2001.01652.x.pdf?v=1&t=h3oj9p2s&s=f70df7f2b3281e17bd370ca180350b35a9252981, (20120620), XP055030539
by applicantUS5631169
 US4868103
 US4843155
 US4683202
 US5854033
 US6892141
 US2005089862
    - AJCC Cancer Staging Manual, LIPPINCOTT, (1997), pages 171 - 180
    - NISTICO ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1999), vol. 84, pages 598 - 603
    - PHILIPS ET AL., BRITISH JOURNAL OF SURGERY, (2004), vol. 91, pages 469 - 475
    - MAKI ET AL., J. GASTROENTEROLGY AND HEPATOLOGY, (2004), vol. 19, pages 1348 - 1356
    - GRUJIL ET AL., BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, (1999), vol. 79, no. 7-8, pages 1127 - 1132
    - REICHERT ET AL., CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (2002), vol. 8, pages 3137 - 3145
    - PRADO-GARCIA ET AL., LUNG CANCER, (2005), vol. 47, pages 361 - 371
    - KUSS ET AL., BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, (2003), vol. 88, pages 223 - 230
    - VALMORI ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2002), vol. 62, pages 1743 - 1750
    - ISHIGAMI ET AL., CANCER, (2002), vol. 94, no. 5, pages 1437 - 1442
    - OSHOKIRI ET AL., JOURNAL OF SURGICAL ONTOLOGY, (2003), vol. 84, pages 224 - 228
    - DIEDERISCHEN ET AL., CANCER IMMUNOL. IMMUNOTHER., (2003), vol. 52, pages 423 - 428
    - ZHANG ET AL., NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (2003), vol. 348, no. 3, pages 203 - 213
    - SJOLANDER, S., URBANICZKY, C., ANAL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 63, pages 2338 - 2345
    - SZABO ET AL., CURR. OPIN. STRUCT. BIOL., (1995), vol. 5, pages 699 - 705
    - RIVAS, G., MINTON, A. P., TRENDS BIOCHEM SCI., (1993), vol. 18, no. 8, pages 284 - 7
    - HEEGAARD, N. H., J. MOL. RECOGNIT. WINTER, (1998), vol. 11, no. 1-6, pages 141 - 8
    - HAGE, D. S., TWEED, S. A., J CHROMATOGR B BIOMED SCI APPL, (19971010), vol. 699, no. 1-2, pages 499 - 525
    - BARANY, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 189 - 193
    - GUATELLI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 1874 - 1878
    - KWOH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 1173 - 1177
    - LIZARDI ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, page 1197
    - KALLIONIEMI, 0., WAGNER, U., KONONEN, J., SAUTER, G., "Tissue microarray technology for high-throughput molecular profiling of cancer", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, (2001), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1093/hmg/10.7.657, pages 657 - 662, XP002306111

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/10.7.657
    - HIGUCHI ET AL., "Kinetics PCR Analysis: Real-time Monitoring of DNA Amplification Reactions", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt0993-1026, pages 1026 - 1030, XP000197685

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0993-1026
    - ISHIGURO ET AL., "Homogeneous quantitative Assay of Hepatitis C Virus RNA by Polymerase Chain Reaction in the Presence of a Fluorescent Intercalater", ANAL. BIOCHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 229, doi:doi:10.1006/abio.1995.1404, pages 20 - 213, XP000533291

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.1995.1404
    - WITTWER ET AL., "Continuous Fluorescence Monitoring of Rapid cycle DNA Amplification", BIOTECHNIQUES, (1997), vol. 22, pages 130 - 138, XP000683698
    - SOUTHERN, E. M., J. MOL. BIOL., (1975), vol. 98, pages 503 - 517
    - SHARP, P. A. ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1980), vol. 65, pages 750 - 768
    - THOMAS, P. S., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI., (1980), vol. 77, pages 5201 - 5205
    - KELLOGG, D. E. ET AL., BIOCHEM., (1990), vol. 189, pages 202 - 208
    - PANG, S. ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 343, pages 85 - 89
    - BECKER-ANDRE, M., METH. MOL. CELL BIOL., (1991), vol. 2, pages 189 - 201
    - PIATAK, M. J. ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1993), vol. 14, pages 70 - 81
    - PIATAK, M. J. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 259, pages 1749 - 1754
    - STURN A, QUACKENBUSH J, TRAJANOSKI Z, "Genesis: cluster analysis of microarray data", BIOINFORMATICS, (2002), vol. 18, no. 1, pages 207 - 8
    - GALON J, FRANCHIMONT D, HIROI N ET AL., "Gene profiling reveals unknown enhancing and suppressive actions of glucocorticoids on immune cells", FASEB J, vol. 16, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1096/fj.01-0245com, (2002), pages 61 - 71, URL: http://www.genome.tugraz.at, XP002240642

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1096/fj.01-0245com
    - J. GALON ET AL., FASEB J, (2002), vol. 16, page 61
    - D.G. ALTMAN ET AL., J. NATL CANCER INST, (1994), vol. 86, page 829
    - D. FARAGGI ET AL., STAT MED, (1996), vol. 15, page 2203
    - N. HOLLANDER ET AL., STAT MED, (2004), vol. 23, page 1701
    - EISEN MB, SPELLMAN PT, BROWN PO, BOTSTEIN D, "Cluster analysis and display of genome-wide expression patterns", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1998), vol. 95, no. 25, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.95.25.14863, pages 14863 - 8, XP002939285

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.25.14863