Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2420838 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2420838



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1409
01.04.2022 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
18.03.2022 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 25
18.03.2022 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
18.03.2022 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
03.01.2022 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
03.01.2022 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
03.01.2022 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 4
13.12.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.12.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.12.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.12.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.12.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
06.12.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.12.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.12.2021 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.11.2021 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
18.11.2021 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
17.11.2021 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 2
17.11.2021 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 2
16.11.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.11.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.11.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.11.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.11.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.11.2021 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
08.11.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.11.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.11.2021 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 2
27.09.2021 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
21.09.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.09.2021 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
02.12.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.12.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.12.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.12.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.11.2020 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
26.11.2020 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
23.11.2020 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
20.11.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.11.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.11.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.11.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
17.11.2020 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
12.11.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.11.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.11.2020 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
17.07.2020 Communication about missing proof of delivery Appeal 1
14.07.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.07.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.07.2020 Communication about missing proof of delivery Appeal 1
14.07.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.06.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.06.2020 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 7
10.06.2020 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 7
03.06.2020 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
03.06.2020 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
28.05.2020 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
27.05.2020 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
14.12.2018 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
13.12.2018 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
27.11.2018 Communication confirming withdrawal from representation Appeal 1
27.11.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
23.11.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.11.2018 Submission concerning change of proprietor's representative Appeal 1
11.08.2017 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 2
11.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.08.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 9
03.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
28.07.2017 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 Appeal 2
28.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.07.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
21.07.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.07.2017 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
29.03.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
29.03.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
24.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
24.03.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
24.03.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
24.03.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.03.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
24.03.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
24.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
24.03.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 21
23.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.03.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 17
23.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.03.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
17.01.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
17.01.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
12.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
12.01.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
04.01.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
04.01.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
23.12.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
22.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
22.12.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
23.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
21.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
14.11.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.11.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.11.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
14.11.2016 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 2
14.11.2016 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 104
14.11.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 15
14.11.2016 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
14.11.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.11.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.11.2016 Means of redress Opposition 2
14.11.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
14.11.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
14.11.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
14.11.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.11.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.11.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.11.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.07.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
01.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 24
01.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
01.07.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
20.06.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
12.05.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.05.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 010 Opposition 17
12.05.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 011 Opposition 1
12.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
12.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
12.05.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
12.05.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
12.05.2016 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
02.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.01.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.01.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.01.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Opposition 1
20.01.2016 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
15.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.01.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
15.01.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
15.01.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.01.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.01.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.01.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.01.2016 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.01.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.01.2016 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
22.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.05.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
11.05.2015 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 1
08.05.2015 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 1
08.05.2015 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 1
17.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
14.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
14.04.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 11
14.04.2015 Citation in opposition procedure - 006 Opposition 4
14.04.2015 Citation in opposition procedure - 007 Opposition 10
14.04.2015 Citation in opposition procedure - 008 Opposition 1
14.04.2015 Citation in opposition procedure - 009 Opposition 5
14.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
14.04.2015 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.04.2015 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
24.02.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
24.02.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
26.01.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
14.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
14.01.2015 Citation in opposition procedure - 001 Opposition 58
14.01.2015 Citation in opposition procedure - 002 Opposition 6
14.01.2015 Citation in opposition procedure - 003 Opposition 7
14.01.2015 Citation in opposition procedure - 004 Opposition 11
14.01.2015 Citation in opposition procedure - 005 Opposition 6
14.01.2015 General authorisation Opposition 1
14.01.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
14.01.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
04.12.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
17.04.2014 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
20.03.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.03.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.03.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
06.03.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
06.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.01.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
07.01.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
07.01.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
07.01.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 185
28.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.06.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 22
28.06.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
28.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.06.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.06.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
03.06.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.03.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
26.03.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
26.03.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
01.10.2012 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
18.09.2012 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
23.08.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.08.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 5
23.08.2012 European search report Search / examination 6
02.05.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
02.05.2012 Partial European search report Search / examination 7
25.01.2012 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
06.12.2011 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 22
25.11.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.11.2011 Drawings Search / examination 14
25.11.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.11.2011 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
22.11.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.11.2011 Claims Search / examination 1
22.11.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
22.11.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
16.11.2011 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
10.11.2011 (Partial) description filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 11
10.11.2011 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
19.10.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
16.09.2011 Deficiencies in application documents - annex B and C Search / examination 4
06.09.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
06.09.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
06.09.2011 Description Search / examination 181
06.09.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.09.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.09.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.09.2011 Drawings Search / examination 14
06.09.2011 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 5
18.05.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 103
18.05.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 99