Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2400224

EP2400224 - Household device with a control unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.09.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
11.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BSH Hausgeräte GmbH
Carl-Wery-Strasse 34
81739 München / DE
[2015/13]
Former [2011/52]For all designated states
BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH
Carl-Wery-Strasse 34
81739 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Casanova Lacueva, David
C/Maria Zambrano,21-P12-9ºA
50018 Zaragoza / ES
02 / Mairal Serrano, Carlos Vicente
Av. Salvador Allende,75,P10-5°C
50015 Zaragoza / ES
03 / Mehlert, Janina
Capitan Oroquieta,10-3ºA
50007 Zaragoza / ES
 [2011/52]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2011/52]
Application number, filing date11180226.027.11.2008
[2011/52]
Priority number, dateES2007000330228.11.2007         Original published format: ES 200703302
[2011/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2400224
Date:28.12.2011
Language:DE
[2011/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2400224
Date:15.08.2012
Language:DE
[2012/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2400224
Date:07.10.2015
Language:DE
[2015/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:F24C7/08, F24C15/10, A47L15/42, D06F39/00
[2011/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/41]
Former [2011/52]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Hausgerät mit einer Steuereinheit[2011/52]
English:Household device with a control unit[2011/52]
French:Appareil ménager doté d'une unité de commande[2011/52]
Examination procedure15.02.2013Examination requested  [2013/13]
20.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.08.2015Fee for grant paid
25.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.08.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08105876.0  / EP2065651
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080105876) is  10.09.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.07.2016   
Electrolux Rothenburg GmbH Factory and Development
Fürther Strasse 246
90429 Nürnberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB
Bankgasse 3
90402 Nürnberg / DE
 [2016/32]
16.08.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.12.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.06.2018Date of oral proceedings
13.09.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.09.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition20.09.2018Appeal received No.  T2394/18
19.12.2018Statement of grounds filed
08.10.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
09.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
02.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.11.2008
BG07.10.2015
CY07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
GR07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
MT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
TR07.10.2015
AT27.11.2015
IE27.11.2015
LU27.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO07.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
[2018/02]
Former [2017/39]HU27.11.2008
BG07.10.2015
CY07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
GR07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
MT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
TR07.10.2015
AT27.11.2015
IE27.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO07.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2017/19]CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
AT27.11.2015
IE27.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO07.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/49]CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
IE27.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO07.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/45]CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
IE27.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO07.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/39]CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO07.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/36]CZ07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO07.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO07.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/33]FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO07.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/25]FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/24]FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/23]HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
Former [2016/22]LT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
Former [2016/21]LT07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
Former [2016/20]LT07.10.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1273851  (THERMA GROSSKUECHEN PRODUKTION [CH]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0012] - [0015] - [0024] - [0028]; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]DE102005040346  (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0002] - [0009]; figures 2-4 *
OppositionEP1273851
 DE19713315
 DE102005027199
 DE202006019447U
 DE102005040346
 DE102005032088
 DE102005043917
 ES2332970