Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2428720

EP2428720 - Light fixture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.08.2013
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.09.2013  [2013/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Woodgate, Terence
West Hill
Little Trodgers Lane
Mayfield East Sussex TN20 6PW / GB
[2012/11]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2012/11]
Representative(s)Hancox, Jonathan Christopher
Thompson Gray LLP
Central Court
25 Southampton Buildings
London WC2A 1AL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/11]Hancox, Jonathan Christopher
Thompson Gray LLP Central Court 25 Southampton Buildings
London WC2A 1AL / GB
Application number, filing date11180648.508.09.2011
[2012/11]
Priority number, dateGB2010001512710.09.2010         Original published format: GB 201015127
[2012/19]
Former [2012/11]GB2010001512710.09.2010
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2428720
Date:14.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2428720
Date:03.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:F21S2/00, F21V21/30, // F21V19/02, F21Y101/02
[2012/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/11]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Beleuchtungskörper[2012/11]
English:Light fixture[2012/11]
French:Dispositif d'éclairage[2012/11]
Examination procedure04.04.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/39]
13.05.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2013/39]
Documents cited:Search[X]DE102004023358  (SMIT MICHAEL [DE]) [X] 1-7,10-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0021] - [0026] * * figures 1-3; claims 1-7 *;
 [X]GB2342435  (KNIGHT RICHARD [GB]) [X] 1-6,10,12-15 * page 4, line 7 - page 5, line 9 * * figures 1-8; claims 1-3,6,7,11,12 *;
 [X]EP1077158  (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,10,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0021] - [0024] * * figures 2,3,5-10 *;
 [X]US4025777  (HAYAKAWA YOSHITO) [X] 1,2,4,5,12-14 * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 14 * * column 6, line 19 - column 7, line 13 * * figures 5,8 *;
 [X]US6120164  (LIBIN CHARLES [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9,14 * column 4, lines 23-26 * * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 19 * * figures 1,3,4A,4B,7A,7B *;
 [X]EP1722156  (TRUMPF KREUZER MED SYS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,15 * paragraphs [0020] , [0022] - [0027] * * figures 1-6 *
by applicantUS2009237924