blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2428720 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2428720



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 89
22.08.2013 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
13.05.2013 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
08.10.2012 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
05.09.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.09.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 5
05.09.2012 European search report Search / examination 2
15.02.2012 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
12.01.2012 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
10.10.2011 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
10.10.2011 Priority document Search / examination 40
08.09.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.09.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
08.09.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
08.09.2011 Description Search / examination 11
08.09.2011 Drawings Search / examination 8
08.09.2011 Priority search results Search / examination 4
08.09.2011 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4