blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2428720


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.08.2013 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  25.09.2013  [2013/39]
13.05.2013 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
31.08.2012 Publication of search report published on  03.10.2012  [2012/40]
31.08.2012 Change - classification published on  03.10.2012  [2012/40]
31.08.2012 Change - classification published on  03.10.2012  [2012/40]
08.04.2012 Change - priority published on  09.05.2012  [2012/19]
14.03.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  14.03.2012  [2012/11]