blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2428720 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP11180648 EP11180650



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2428721Global Dossier 03.10.2012A3
EP2428721 14.03.2012A2
Priority number Date
GB201015127 10.09.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2428720Global Dossier 03.10.2012A3
EP2428720 14.03.2012A2
Priority number Date
GB201015127 10.09.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB2483500 14.03.2012A
GB201015127D 27.10.2010D0
Priority number Date
GB201015127 10.09.2010