Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2412250 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2412250



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2540
17.10.2019 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
11.10.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 2
10.10.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
04.10.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
01.10.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.09.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
26.09.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 16
26.09.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 3
17.07.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.07.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.06.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
18.06.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.06.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.06.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.06.2019 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
12.06.2019 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Appeal 2
31.05.2019 Request for transfer of rights - opponent Appeal 11
13.05.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.05.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.05.2019 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
18.04.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.04.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.04.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.04.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.04.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
09.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.04.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
05.04.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.04.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.04.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
01.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
01.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.04.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.04.2019 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
01.04.2019 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 26
01.04.2019 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
01.04.2019 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
01.04.2019 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
28.03.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
27.03.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.03.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
20.03.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 2
19.03.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.03.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 5
18.03.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 5
18.03.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 5
14.03.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
14.03.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
14.03.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
11.03.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
11.03.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
02.10.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.10.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.09.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
10.09.2018 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Opposition 1
24.08.2018 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
16.07.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.07.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.07.2018 Reply to appeal Appeal 3
30.05.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.05.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
25.05.2018 Reply to appeal Appeal 9
28.02.2018 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.02.2018 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
23.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.02.2018 Claims Appeal 3
23.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.02.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
23.02.2018 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
02.01.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
08.12.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
05.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
05.12.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
08.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.10.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
17.10.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
17.10.2017 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
17.10.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 5
17.10.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
17.10.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
17.10.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
17.10.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.10.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.09.2017 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
19.07.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
18.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
18.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
18.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
18.07.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.07.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
18.07.2017 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
18.07.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
10.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
28.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
28.06.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.04.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 25
24.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.02.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.02.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.02.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.02.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
01.02.2017 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
01.02.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
01.02.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.02.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.02.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.02.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 40
21.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 40
14.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
14.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 15
14.12.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.12.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
14.12.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.12.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.12.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
14.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
14.12.2016 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
14.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
11.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.10.2016 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
13.06.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
13.06.2016 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
13.06.2016 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
10.05.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.05.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
28.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
28.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
28.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
28.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
28.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
28.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
28.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
28.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
28.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
28.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
28.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
28.04.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
28.04.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
28.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 81
28.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 78
28.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
28.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
28.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 62
28.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
28.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
28.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
28.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 59
28.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 49
28.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
25.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
25.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
25.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
25.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
25.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
25.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
25.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
25.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
25.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
25.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
25.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
25.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
25.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
25.04.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
25.04.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 34
25.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 49
25.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
25.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
25.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 78
25.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 59
25.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
25.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
25.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 62
25.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
25.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
25.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
25.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
25.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
25.04.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 81
05.08.2015 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
09.07.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.06.2015 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
15.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.10.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.10.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
15.10.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
15.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
11.08.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
11.08.2014 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 343
06.08.2014 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
29.07.2014 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 14
29.07.2014 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 10
29.07.2014 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 12
29.07.2014 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 10
29.07.2014 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 16
29.07.2014 Observations by third parties Search / examination 8
29.07.2014 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 82
29.07.2014 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 50
29.07.2014 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 62
29.07.2014 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 60
29.07.2014 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 18
11.06.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
11.06.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
11.06.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
11.06.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
11.06.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.05.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
22.01.2013 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
04.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.12.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.12.2012 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 2
04.12.2012 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
28.09.2012 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no declaration of maintenance of the application/non-reply to the Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
06.03.2012 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
27.02.2012 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
20.01.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.01.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 2
20.01.2012 European search report Search / examination 2
04.01.2012 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
29.09.2011 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 14
13.09.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.09.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
13.09.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
13.09.2011 Description Search / examination 17
13.09.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.09.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.09.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.09.2011 Drawings Search / examination 1
13.09.2011 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
13.09.2011 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
20.01.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 20