Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2447168

EP2447168 - Method and device for gathering a bundle of filled containers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.08.2015
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Krones AG
Böhmerwaldstraße 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
[2012/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Hahn, Wolfgang
Am Weiheracker 60
93073 Neutraubling / DE
02 / Forsthövel, Jochen
Guttensteinweg 11
93059 Regensburg / DE
03 / Senn, Konrad
Untere Regenstraße 5
93059 Regensburg / DE
04 / Zölfl, Markus
Frauenwiese 3
94526 Metten / DE
05 / Winzinger, Frank
Kesselschmiedstrasse 8
85354 Freising / DE
06 / Sobiech, Bernd
Weinweg 3
93049 Regensburg / DE
07 / Raith, Stefan
Straubinger Straße 5
93102 Pfatter / DE
08 / Donhauser, Alexandra
Weißgerbergraben 10
93047 Regensburg / DE
09 / Berger, Clemens
Am Hohensand 28
93138 Lappersdorf / DE
10 / Hausladen, Josef
Im Blindfenster 1B
93086 Wörth/Donau / DE
 [2012/33]
Former [2012/18]01 / Hahn, Wolfgang
Am Weiheracker 60
93073 Neutraubling / DE
02 / Forsthövel, Jochen
Guttensteinweg 11
93059 Regensburg / DE
03 / Senn, Konrad
Untere Regenstraße 5
93059 Regensburg / DE
04 / Zölfl, Markus
Frauenwiese 3
94526 Metten / DE
05 / Winzinger, Frank
Clermont-Ferrand-Allee 31
93049 Regensburg / DE
06 / Sobiech, Bernd
Weinweg 3
93049 Regensburg / DE
07 / Raith, Stefan
Straubinger Straße 5
93102 Pfatter / DE
08 / Donhauser, Alexandra
Weißgerbergraben 10
93047 Regensburg / DE
09 / Berger, Clemens
Am Hohensand 28
93138 Lappersdorf / DE
10 / Hausladen, Josef
Im Blindfenster 1B
93086 Wörth/Donau / DE
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/18]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date11181230.114.09.2011
[2012/18]
Priority number, dateDE2010104292526.10.2010         Original published format: DE102010042925
[2012/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2447168
Date:02.05.2012
Language:DE
[2012/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2012
ClassificationInternational:B65B5/12, B65B21/06, B65G61/00, B65B65/00, B65G47/08
[2012/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Zusammenstellen eines Gebindes aus befüllten Behältern[2012/18]
English:Method and device for gathering a bundle of filled containers[2012/18]
French:Procédé et dispositif d'assemblage d'une gerbe à partir de récipients remplis[2012/18]
Examination procedure06.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.09.2012Examination requested  [2012/43]
29.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.11.2016
26.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
10.11.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Appeal following examination05.04.2016Appeal received No.  T1531/16
06.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.04.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
13.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9955603  (CERTUS MASCHBAU GMBH [DE]; HOEFER GUNTER [DE]; HIRSCHEK HERWIG [DE]) [X] 1,12,13,18 * page 7, line 30 - page 26, line 20 * * figures 1-7 * [Y] 2-11,14-17;
 [XY]WO2008122480  (DEMATIC GMBH [DE]; FRITZSCHE ROLAND [DE]) [X] 13 * page 1, line 13 - page 2, line 1 * * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 12 * * page 9, line 25 - page 13, line 15 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 1-12,14-18;
 [XY]DE202005019906U  (AUTEFA AUTOMATION GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,13 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0051] * * figures 1-5 * [Y] 2-12,14-18;
 [Y]US7266422  (DEMOTTE DONALD [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-18 * column 2, line 28 - column 9, line 69 * * figures 1-10 *;
 [Y]WO03013975  (SDK CO INC [US]; CLAY FORREST KELLY [US]) [Y] 1-18 * page 5, line 5 - page 11, line 28 * * figures 1-7 *