Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2551786

EP2551786 - Efficient securing of data on mobile devices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.02.2016
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kaspersky Lab, ZAO
39A/3 Leningradskoe Shosse
Moscow 125212 / RU
[2014/01]
Former [2013/05]For all designated states
Kaspersky Lab, ZAO
10 Geroyev Panfilovtsev Street
Moscow 125363 / RU
Inventor(s)01 / Nevstruev, Sergey V.
c/o KASPERSKY LAB ZAO
10/1 1st Volokolamsky Proezd
123060 Moscow / RU
02 / Nestruev, Oleg V.
c/o KASPERSKY LAB ZAO
10/1 1st Volokolamsky Proezd
123060 Moscow / RU
03 / Matveev, Andrey V.
c/o KASPERSKY LAB ZAO
10/1 1st Volokolamsky Proezd
123060 Moscow / RU
 [2013/05]
Representative(s)Sloboshanin, Sergej , et al
V. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano
Patentanwälte
Mariahilfplatz 3
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/05]Sloboshanin, Sergej , et al
von Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 3
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date11181540.316.09.2011
[2013/05]
Priority number, dateUS20111319085326.07.2011         Original published format: US201113190853
[2013/13]
Former [2013/05]US2011019085326.07.2011
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2551786
Date:30.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2551786
Date:03.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2551786
Date:22.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/62, G06F21/88
[2013/14]
Former International [2013/05]G06F21/60
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/17]
Former [2013/05]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Effizientes Sichern von Daten auf mobilen Vorrichtungen[2013/05]
English:Efficient securing of data on mobile devices[2013/05]
French:Sécurisation efficace de données sur des dispositifs mobiles[2013/05]
Examination procedure16.09.2011Examination requested  [2013/05]
24.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
31.10.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
27.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.03.2015Fee for grant paid
10.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.10.2013
Opposition(s)25.01.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.09.2011
AL22.04.2015
AT22.04.2015
BE22.04.2015
BG22.04.2015
CY22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
IT22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
MK22.04.2015
MT22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SE22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
SM22.04.2015
TR22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
IE16.09.2015
LU16.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU16.09.2011
AT22.04.2015
BE22.04.2015
BG22.04.2015
CY22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
IT22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
MK22.04.2015
MT22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SE22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
SM22.04.2015
TR22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
IE16.09.2015
LU16.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2017/38]HU16.09.2011
AT22.04.2015
BE22.04.2015
BG22.04.2015
CY22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
IT22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
MT22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SE22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
SM22.04.2015
TR22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
IE16.09.2015
LU16.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2017/22]AT22.04.2015
BE22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
IT22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
MT22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
IE16.09.2015
LU16.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2016/37]AT22.04.2015
BE22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
IT22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
IE16.09.2015
LU16.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2016/33]AT22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
IT22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
IE16.09.2015
LU16.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2016/24]AT22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
IT22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
LU16.09.2015
Former [2016/23]AT22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
IT22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
LU16.09.2015
Former [2016/21]AT22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
IT22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
LU16.09.2015
Former [2016/10]AT22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2016/09]AT22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2016/07]AT22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2015/50]ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2015/49]ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2015/42]NL22.04.2015
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2010127455  (ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE CORP [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,10,11 * page 1, paragraph 2; figure 1 * * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 4 * * page 8, paragraph 2 * * page 11, paragraph 2 * [I] 3-9,12-15;
 [I]US2009106845  (LI KO-MAI [TW]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0024] *;
 [I]US2006075263  (TAYLOR JESSE [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0039] *;
 [I]US2010211716  (CHEN LI-TAO [CN]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0038]; claim 3 *