Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2439659

EP2439659 - Method for updating an inverted index and server implementing said method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.10.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
[2012/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Brochard, Pierre
4 Le Pré La Petite Beauce
91530 Saint Cheron / FR
 [2012/15]
Representative(s)Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/15]Delumeau, François Guy , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date11183897.505.10.2011
[2012/15]
Priority number, dateFR2010005809506.10.2010         Original published format: FR 1058095
[2012/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2439659
Date:11.04.2012
Language:FR
[2012/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2012/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Aktualisierung eines umgekehrten Index und Server, der dieses Verfahren umsetzt[2012/15]
English:Method for updating an inverted index and server implementing said method[2012/15]
French:Procédé de mise à jour d'un index inversé et serveur mettant en oeuvre ce procédé[2012/15]
Examination procedure05.10.2011Examination requested  [2012/15]
05.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.2017Date of oral proceedings
15.05.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
17.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination11.07.2017Appeal received No.  T2390/17
18.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.04.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
24.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
24.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
22.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
22.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[I]US2003225779  (MATSUDA YASUHIRO [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0044] *;
 [I]  - Nuno Alberto Ferreira Lopes, "A Peer-to-Peer Inverted Index Implementation for Word-Based Content Search", (2003), University paper, URL: http://citeseerx.ist.psu.edu/viewdoc/summary?doi=10.1.1.10.1776, (20110922), XP002659767 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [I]  - D. CUTTING ET AL, "Optimization for dynamic inverted index maintenance", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 13TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL ACM SIGIR CONFERENCE ON RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT IN INFORMATION RETRIEVAL , SIGIR '90, New York, New York, USA, (19900101), doi:10.1145/96749.98245, ISBN 978-0-89-791408-6, pages 405 - 411, XP055007809 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/96749.98245
 [A]  - JACO GELDENHUYS, BRINK VAN DER MERWE, "Comparing Leaf and Root Insertion", SOUTH AFRICAN COMPUTER JOURNAL, (2009), vol. 44, pages 30 - 38, XP002662453 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * Introduction *