blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2578412 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2578412



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 125
25.04.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
30.04.2015 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
27.06.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
30.05.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.05.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.05.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
15.05.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
15.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
11.04.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
01.04.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
01.04.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
24.02.2014 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 10
21.02.2014 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 3
18.02.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 5
24.01.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
24.01.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
24.01.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.01.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
13.12.2013 Examination started Search / examination 1
01.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.08.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
01.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
01.08.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
01.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.04.2013 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
13.03.2013 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
03.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.04.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.04.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 3
11.04.2012 European search report Search / examination 3
07.10.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.10.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
07.10.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
07.10.2011 Description Search / examination 23
07.10.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.10.2011 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4