blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2578412
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014209231Global Dossier 31.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US58693 04.10.2012
EP11184298 07.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6151702BGlobal Dossier 21.06.2017B2
JP2014534989 25.12.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012US58693 04.10.2012
EP11184298 07.10.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013052624Global Dossier 11.04.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP11184298 07.10.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2578412Global Dossier 25.06.2014B1
EP2578412 10.04.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP11184298 07.10.2011