Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2578412

EP2578412 - Printable film [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.05.2015
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2013/15]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Schappert, Klaus
3M Deutschland GmbH
Carl-Schurz-Straße 1
41453 Neuss / DE
 [2013/15]
Representative(s)Gabriel, Kiroubagaranne , et al
3M Belgium B.V.B.A./S.P.R.L.
Hermeslaan 7
1831 Diegem / BE
[2014/20]
Former [2013/15]Voortmans, Gilbert J.L.
3M Europe S.A./N.V. OIPC Hermeslaan 7
1831 Diegem / BE
Application number, filing date11184298.507.10.2011
[2013/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2578412
Date:10.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2578412
Date:25.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.2012
ClassificationInternational:B41M5/52, B41M5/50, B41M5/00
[2013/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/15]
TitleGerman:Bedruckbare Folie[2013/15]
English:Printable film[2013/15]
French:Film imprimable[2013/15]
Examination procedure01.08.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.08.2013Examination requested  [2013/37]
24.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2014Fee for grant paid
15.05.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.01.2014
Opposition(s)26.03.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.10.2011
AL25.06.2014
AT25.06.2014
BE25.06.2014
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
MK25.06.2014
MT25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
SM25.06.2014
TR25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IE07.10.2014
LU07.10.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU07.10.2011
AT25.06.2014
BE25.06.2014
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
MK25.06.2014
MT25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
SM25.06.2014
TR25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IE07.10.2014
LU07.10.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
Former [2016/33]HU07.10.2011
AT25.06.2014
BE25.06.2014
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
MT25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
SM25.06.2014
TR25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IE07.10.2014
LU07.10.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
Former [2016/32]HU07.10.2011
AT25.06.2014
BE25.06.2014
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
SM25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IE07.10.2014
LU07.10.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
Former [2016/31]AT25.06.2014
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
SM25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IE07.10.2014
LU07.10.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
Former [2016/22]AT25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
SM25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IE07.10.2014
LU07.10.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
Former [2015/50]AT25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IE07.10.2014
LU07.10.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
Former [2015/46]AT25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IE07.10.2014
LU07.10.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
Former [2015/33]AT25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
LU07.10.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
Former [2015/27]AT25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
LU07.10.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2015/26]AT25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
LU07.10.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2015/22]AT25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2015/12]AT25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2015/11]CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2015/10]CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
Former [2014/52]CY25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
Former [2014/48]CY25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
Former [2014/47]CY25.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[XD]US6869496  (KOLLAJA RICHARD A [US], et al) [XD] 1-14 * column 3, line 19 - column 11, line 62 *;
 [XA]EP2353881  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 13,14 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0049] * [A] 1-12;
 [XDA]US2003107635  (KINNING DAVID J [US], et al) [XD] 13,14 * paragraphs [0014] , [0017] , [0018] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045] * [A] 1-12;
 [XA]EP1932677  (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 13 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0025] * [A] 1-12,14;
 [XA]DE102005028161  (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 13 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] , [0018] * [A] 1-12,14;
 [AD]US6113679  (ADKINS RONALD R [US], et al) [AD] 1-14 * column 3, line 29 - column 5, line 55 *
by applicantUS2003235681
 WO03002353
 US2003224150
 US2003107635
 US6869496
 US4994322
 US4968562
 EP0570515
 EP0617708
 US5296277
 US5362516
 US5141790
 WO9601687
 USRE24906E
 US4833179
 US5209971
 US2736721
 US5461134
 US4181752
 US4418120
 WO9513331
 EP0279579
 WO9829516
 US6113679
    - Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and E ngineering, WLEY -INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1988), vol. 13
    - Encyclopedia of Polymer Scieinced and Engineering, WILEY-INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1964), vol. 13
    - C.W. MACOSKO, RHEOLOGY: PRINCIPLES, MEASUREMENTS, AND APPLICATIONS, page 85