Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2417943

EP2417943 - Drug-delivery endovascular stent for treating restenosis [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2012/07]Drug-delivery endovascular stent and method for treating restenosis
[2014/13]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.07.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biosensors International Group, Ltd.
Clarendon House
2 Church Street
Hamilton HM 11 / BM
[2014/35]
Former [2012/07]For all designated states
Biosensors International Group Ltd.
Clarendon House 2 Church Street
Hamilton HM 11 / BM
Inventor(s)01 / Shulze, John E
8 Serna Rancho
Santa Margarita, CA California CA 92688 / US
02 / Betts, Ronald E
6627 Aranda Avenue
La Jolla, California CA 92688 / US
03 / Savage, Douglas R
2361 Recuerdo
Cove Del Mar, CA California CA 92104 / US
 [2012/07]
Representative(s)Williams, Paul Edwin
Lewis Silkin LLP
5 Chancery Lane
Clifford's Inn
London EC4A 1BL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/35]Williams, Paul Edwin , et al
Ablett & Stebbing
7-8 Market Place
London W1W 8AG / GB
Former [2012/07]Williams, Paul Edwin , et al
Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street
London W1U 6FQ / GB
Application number, filing date11185222.424.04.2003
[2012/07]
Priority number, dateUS2002013381424.04.2002         Original published format: US 133814
[2012/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2417943
Date:15.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2417943
Date:27.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.01.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/90, A61F2/06, A61L31/08, A61L31/16
[2012/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/07]
TitleGerman:Endovaskulärer Arzneimittelabgabe-Stent und Verfahren zur Behandlung von Restenose[2017/03]
English:Drug-delivery endovascular stent for treating restenosis[2014/13]
French:Endoprothèse endovasculaire pour la distribution de médicaments et procédé de traitement de la resténose[2017/03]
Former [2012/07]Endovaskulärer Arzneimittelabgabe-Stent und Verfahren zur Behandlung von Restenose
Former [2012/07]Drug-delivery endovascular stent and method for treating restenosis
Former [2012/07]Endoprothèse endovasculaire pour la distribution de médicaments et procédé de traitement de la resténose
Examination procedure15.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.08.2012Examination requested  [2012/39]
05.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.07.2014Fee for grant paid
11.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03747310.5  / EP1505930
EP04078429.0  / EP1518517
EP09160438.9  / EP2113230
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030747310) is  01.08.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.05.2015  03.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Abbott Cardiovascular Systems Inc.
3200 Lakeside Drive
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2015/28]
Opponent(s)01  26.05.2015  03.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Abbott Cardiovascular Systems Inc.
3200 Lakeside Drive
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
26.06.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.01.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
13.01.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.01.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition20.03.2017Appeal received No.  T0629/17
22.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
13.03.2017Appeal received No.  T0629/17
22.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
12.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.04.2003
AT27.08.2014
BE27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
TR27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
IE24.04.2015
LU24.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
[2017/40]
Former [2016/33]AT27.08.2014
BE27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
IE24.04.2015
LU24.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/20]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
IE24.04.2015
LU24.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/06]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
LU24.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/01]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
LU24.04.2015
Former [2015/52]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
LU24.04.2015
Former [2015/50]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/23]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/22]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/16]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/12]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/10]ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
Former [2015/09]FI27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
Documents cited:Search[I]WO0187368  (ORTHO MCNEIL PHARM INC [US]) [I] 1-12 * page 17, line 2 - line 14 * * page 19, line 3 - line 4 * * page 20, line 26 - page 21, line 6 *;
 [A]WO0226281  (CORDIS CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 35, line 6 - line 9 *
by applicantWO9907308
 US6099562
 US5873904
 US5342348
 US5707385
 US5824048
 US5527337
 US5306286
 US6013853
 US6231600
 US5288711
 US6159488
 US6171609
 US5176908
 US5733327
 US6153252
 WO9735575
 US6190406
 US6042606
 US5860999
 US6129755
 US5902317
 US2001027340
 WO0015763
 US4650803
 US5516781
 US5565772
 US6273913
 US2001002935
 US4990155
 US6080177
 US6299604
    - SCHWARTZ ET AL., "Restenosis After Balloon Angioplasty-A Practical Proliferative Model in Porcine Coronary Arteries", CIRCULATION, (199012), vol. 82, no. 6, pages 2190 - 2200
 US20001176086