Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2587242

EP2587242 - Leak detector for a double-wall tank [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.12.2017
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2018Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 16.01.2019  [2019/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AFRISO-Euro-Index GmbH
Lindenstrasse 20
74363 Güglingen / DE
[2013/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Heinz, Thomas
Mutterbachstr. 11
74374 Zaberfeld / DE
02 / Grob, Nadine
Cortzingstr. 15
74906 Bad Rappenau / DE
 [2013/18]
Representative(s)Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Gropiusplatz 10
70563 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/40]Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Ruppmannstraße 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2013/18]Kohler Schmid Möbus
Patentanwälte Ruppmannstraße 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date11186605.926.10.2011
[2013/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2587242
Date:01.05.2013
Language:DE
[2013/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2587242
Date:30.09.2015
Language:DE
[2015/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.2012
ClassificationInternational:G01M3/32, G01F23/00
[2013/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/18]
TitleGerman:Leckagesonde für einen doppelwandigen Tank[2013/18]
English:Leak detector for a double-wall tank[2013/18]
French:Sonde de détection de fuite pour un réservoir à double paroi[2013/18]
Examination procedure11.06.2012Examination requested  [2013/18]
12.06.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2015Fee for grant paid
18.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.08.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.10.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.06.2016  06.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
G. Ohliger GmbH & Co. Kg
Ober der Mühle 27
42699 Solingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Walther Hinz Bayer PartGmbB
Heimradstrasse 2
34130 Kassel / DE
 [2019/03]
Former [2018/48]
Opponent(s)01  30.06.2016  06.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
G. Ohliger GmbH & Co. Kg
Ober der Mühle 27
42699 Solingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hinz, Claus-Dieter
Patentanwälte Walther Hinz Bayer PartGmbB
Heimradstraße 2
D-34130 Kassel / DE
Former [2018/39]
Opponent(s)01  30.06.2016  06.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
G. Ohliger GmbH & Co. Kg
Ober der Mühle 27
42699 Solingen / DE
Former [2016/32]
Opponent(s)01  30.06.2016   
G. Ohliger GmbH & Co. Kg
Ober der Mühle 27
42699 Solingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Walther, Walther & Hinz GbR
Heimradstrasse 2
34130 Kassel / DE
08.08.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.12.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.11.2017Date of oral proceedings
11.12.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.12.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition12.02.2018Appeal received No.  T0488/18
11.04.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.10.2011
AL30.09.2015
BG30.09.2015
CY30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
MK30.09.2015
MT30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
SM30.09.2015
TR30.09.2015
IE26.10.2015
LU26.10.2015
BE31.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
GB30.12.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
AT26.10.2016
[2018/47]
Former [2018/31]HU26.10.2011
BG30.09.2015
CY30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
MK30.09.2015
MT30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
SM30.09.2015
TR30.09.2015
IE26.10.2015
LU26.10.2015
BE31.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
GB30.12.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
AT26.10.2016
Former [2018/10]HU26.10.2011
BG30.09.2015
CY30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
MT30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
SM30.09.2015
IE26.10.2015
LU26.10.2015
BE31.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
GB30.12.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
AT26.10.2016
Former [2018/02]HU26.10.2011
BG30.09.2015
CY30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
MT30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
SM30.09.2015
IE26.10.2015
LU26.10.2015
BE31.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
GB30.12.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2017/38]HU26.10.2011
BG30.09.2015
CY30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
MT30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
SM30.09.2015
IE26.10.2015
BE31.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
GB30.12.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/49]CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
IE26.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
GB30.12.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/47]CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
IE26.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
GB30.12.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/45]CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
IE26.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/39]CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/28]CZ30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/24]CZ30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/23]CZ30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
Former [2016/22]CZ30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
Former [2016/21]ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
Former [2016/20]ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
Former [2016/10]FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
Former [2016/08]LT30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
Former [2016/07]LT30.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[XYI]FR562337  (H-V JOIRE) [X] 1,2,8 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 9 * * figure 1 * [Y] 3 [I] 4-7,9;
 [YD]DE29916373U  (AFRISO EURO INDEX GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-11 * abstract * * page 1 - page 2 * * page 3 - page 9 * * figures 1-2 *;
 [Y]GB240431  (PIERRE KRUMM, et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 1, line 10 - page 1, line 61 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]FR601739  (E SEIGNOL; P KRUMM) [Y] 1-11 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 66 * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE8902770U  (W E HENKEL) [Y] 1,10,11 * page 1 - page 3 * * figure 1 *
ExaminationDE29916373U
 DE8902770U
by applicantDE7131570U
 DE29916373U
OppositionDE29916373U
 FR562337
 FR601739
 DE8516617U
    - "Leak Guard", BJ Enterprises Inc., (20070000), XP055293499