Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2587252

EP2587252 - Individual molecule detection by plasmonic nanoparticles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.04.2016
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.05.2016  [2016/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sönnichsen, Carsten
Jakob-Welder-Weg 11
55128 Mainz / DE
[2013/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Sönnichsen, Carsten
c/o Institut für Physikalische Chemie
Jakob-Welder-Weg 11
55128 Mainz / DE
02 / Ament, Irene
Drechslerweg 12B
55128 Mainz / DE
 [2013/18]
Representative(s)Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Bavariaring 11
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/18]Müller Schupfner & Partner
Bavariaring 11
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date11186650.526.10.2011
[2013/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2587252
Date:01.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/55, G01N33/543, B82Y15/00, B82Y30/00, G01N15/14
[2013/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Einzelmolekülerkennung durch plasmonische Nanopartikel[2013/18]
English:Individual molecule detection by plasmonic nanoparticles[2013/18]
French:Détection de molécule individuelle par nanoparticules plasmoniques[2013/18]
Examination procedure24.10.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2013Examination requested  [2013/49]
26.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/20]
14.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/20]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.05.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
01.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201505   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2004042403  (LUDWIG MAXIMILIAN UNI VERSITAE [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,6-8,10-16 * pages 3-17 * * pages 20, 21; figures 1,2,5-9,17,19; examples 1,2; claims 1,13,15,16,18,19,26,28,30,32,44,46,47,48,49,51-55 * [I] 2,3,5,9;
 [XI]US2010196920  (LEE LUKE P [US], et al) [X] 1,6-9,13-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0020] , [0021] , [0032] , [0039] , [0046] , [0047] , [0054] , [0057] , [0058] , [0078] , [0084]; figure 1D * [I] 2,3,10-12,16;
 [I]  SÖNNICHSEN C ET AL, "Spectroscopy of single metallic nanoparticles using total internal reflection microscopy", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20001106), vol. 77, no. 19, doi:10.1063/1.1323553, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 2949 - 2951, XP012026520 [I] 1,2,5-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1323553
 [I]  RASCHKE G ET AL, "Biomolecular sensor based on optical spectroscopy of single gold nanoparticles", LASERS AND ELECTRO-OPTICS, 2004. (CLEO). CONFERENCE ON SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA MAY 20-21, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040516), ISBN 978-1-55752-777-6, XP032015921 [I] 1,2,6-9,12-15 * the whole document *
by applicant   K.M. MAYER, J. H. HAFNER, "Localized Surface Plasmon Resonance Sensors", CHEM. REV., (2011), vol. 111, doi:doi:10.1021/cr100313v, pages 3828 - 3857, XP055125519

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cr100313v
    SONNICHSEN, C. ET AL., "Drastic reduction of plasmon damping in gold nanorods", PHYS. REV. LET., (2002), vol. 88, page 077402,
    JAIN, P. K., HUANG, X., EI-SAYED, . H., EI-SAYED, M. A., "Noble Metals on the Nanoscale", OPTICAL AND PHOTOTHERMAL PROPERTIES AND SOME APPLICATIONS IN IMAGING, SENSING, BIOLOGY, AND MEDICINE. ACC. CHEM. RES., (2008), vol. 41, doi:doi:10.1021/ar7002804, pages 1578 - 1586, XP055160359

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ar7002804
    ANAND, G., SHARMA, S., DUTTA, A. K, KUMAR, S. K., BELFORT, G, "Conformational Transitions of Adsorbed Proteins on Surfaces of Varying Polarity", LANGMUIR, (2010), vol. 26, pages 10803 - 10811,
    LUTHGENS, E., JANSHOFF, A., "Equilibrium coverage fluctuations: A new approach to quantify reversible adsorption of proteins", CHEMPHYSCHEM, (2005), vol. 6, pages 444 - 448,
    KUBO, R., "Fluctuation-Dissipation Theorem", REP. PROG. PHYS., (1966), vol. 29, page 255,
    JARZYNSKI, C., "Nonequilibrium equality for free energy differences", PHYS. REV. LET., (1997), vol. 78, pages 2690 - 2693,
    LIU, N. ET AL., "Three-dimensional photonic metamaterials at optical frequencies", NAT. MATER., (2008), vol. 7, doi:doi:10.1038/NMAT2072, pages 31 - 37, XP002725299

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NMAT2072
    KHALAVKA, Y., BECKER, J., SONNICHSEN, C., "Synthesis of Rod-Shaped Gold Nanorattles with Improved Plasmon Sensitivity and Catalytic Activity", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2009), vol. 131, doi:doi:10.1021/ja806766w, pages 1871 - 1875, XP055008724

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja806766w
    JAKAB, A., ACS NANO ET AL., "Highly Sensitive Plasmonic Silver Nanorods", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2011), vol. 5, pages 6880 - 6885,
    ACIMOVIC, S. S, KREUZER, M. P., GONZALEZ, M. U, QUIDANT, R, "Plasmon Near-Field Coupling in Metal Dimers as a Step toward Single-Molecule Sensing", ACS NANO, (2009), vol. 3, pages 1231 - 1237,
    LIU, N., HENTSCHEL, M., WEISS, T., ALIVISATOS, A. P., GIESSEN, H, "Three-Dimensional Plasmon Rulers", SCIENCE, (2011), vol. 332, pages 1407 - 1410,
    LIU, N., TANG, M. L., HENTSCHEL, M., GIESSEN, H., ALIVISATOS, A. P., "Nanoantenna-enhanced gas sensing in a single tailored nanofocus", NAT. MATER., (2011), vol. 10, pages 631 - 636,