Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2590349

EP2590349 - A method for scheduling a scalable video coding stream in a wireless mobile network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.08.2015
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NTT DoCoMo, Inc.
Sanno Park Tower
36th Floor 11-1 Nagata-cho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2013/19]For all designated states
NTT DoCoMo, Inc.
Sanno Park Tower 36th Floor 11-1 Nagata-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Omiyi, Peter
Flat 38 Vicent Court
Bell Lane
London NW4 2 AN / GB
02 / Martini, Maria M.
6, The Avenue
KT58JG Surbiton
London / GB
03 / Bharucha, Zubin
60/6 Rankin Drive
Edinburgh, EH9 3DJ / GB
04 / Auer, Gunther
Westendstrasse 61
80339 Munich / DE
 [2013/19]
Representative(s)Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus
Schoppe, Zimmermann
Stöckeler & Zinkler & Partner
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Former [2013/19]Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus
Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann
Stöckeler, Zinkler & Partner
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach / DE
Application number, filing date11187721.303.11.2011
[2013/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2590349
Date:08.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2590349
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04L5/00, H04W72/04
[2013/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/19]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Planung eines skalierbaren Videokodierungsstroms in einem drahtlosen mobilen Netzwerk[2013/19]
English:A method for scheduling a scalable video coding stream in a wireless mobile network[2013/19]
French:Procédé de planification d'un flux de codage vidéo extensible dans un réseau mobile sans fil[2013/19]
Examination procedure02.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.11.2012Examination requested  [2013/19]
16.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.09.2014Fee for grant paid
08.09.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.09.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.05.2014
Opposition(s)16.07.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.11.2011
AL15.10.2014
AT15.10.2014
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
IT15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MK15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
TR15.10.2014
IE03.11.2014
LU03.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR15.12.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU03.11.2011
AT15.10.2014
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
IT15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MK15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
TR15.10.2014
IE03.11.2014
LU03.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR15.12.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2016/33]HU03.11.2011
AT15.10.2014
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
IT15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
TR15.10.2014
IE03.11.2014
LU03.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR15.12.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2016/32]HU03.11.2011
AT15.10.2014
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
IT15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
IE03.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR15.12.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2016/31]AT15.10.2014
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
IT15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
IE03.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR15.12.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2016/22]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
IT15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
IE03.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR15.12.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2016/12]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
IT15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
IE03.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR15.12.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/51]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
IT15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
IE03.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR15.12.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/46]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
IT15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
IE03.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/37]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
IT15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/36]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/35]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/33]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/30]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
BE30.11.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/26]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/25]AT15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/24]ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/23]ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/22]LT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/21]LT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
Former [2015/20]LT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
Former [2015/16]NL15.10.2014
Documents cited:Search[XAY]  BASARAN C ET AL, "Bandwidth Consumption Control and Service Differentiation for Video Streaming", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKS, 2008. ICCCN '08. PROCEEDINGS OF 17TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080803), ISBN 978-1-4244-2389-7, pages 1 - 6, XP031825143 [X] 1-3,5-10,13-15 * the whole document * [A] 4,12 [Y] 11
 [Y]  CHIH-WEI HUANG ET AL, "Layered Video Resource Allocation in Mobile WiMAX Using Opportunistic Multicasting", WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE, 2009. WCNC 2009. IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090405), ISBN 978-1-4244-2947-9, pages 1 - 6, XP031454273 [Y] 1-3,5-10,13-15 * abstract * * sections I, III and IV *
 [Y]  JUNU KIM ET AL, "Layered resource allocation for video broadcasts over wireless networks", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20081101), vol. 54, no. 4, doi:10.1109/TCE.2008.4711209, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 1609 - 1616, XP011239721 [Y] 1-3,5-10,13-15 * sections II, III and IV *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCE.2008.4711209
 [Y]  JEN-WEN DING ET AL, "Adaptive bandwidth allocation for layered video streams over wireless broadcast channels", COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING IN CHINA, 2009. CHINACOM 2009. FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090826), ISBN 978-1-4244-4337-6, pages 1 - 5, XP031570623 [Y] 1-3,5-10,13-15 * abstract * * sections I and III * * table 1 *
 [Y]  MIKKO MYLLYNIEMI ET AL, "Fuzzy Logic-based Cross-layer Controller for Wireless Video Transmission", COMPUTERS AND COMMUNICATIONS, 2007. ISCC 2007. IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PI, (20070701), ISBN 978-1-4244-1520-5, pages MW - 21, XP031159859 [Y] 1-3,5-10,13-15 * the whole document *
 [YA]  JUN XU ET AL, "Quasi-Optimal Channel Assignment for Real-Time Video in OFDM Wireless Systems", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20080401), vol. 7, no. 4, ISSN 1536-1276, pages 1417 - 1427, XP011207548 [Y] 11 * abstract * * V.A Spectral Efficiency * * V.B. QoS Performance Analysis * [A] 12
 [YA]  AMMAR M H ET AL, "Optimal Quality Adaptation for Scalable Encoded Video", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20050201), vol. 23, no. 2, doi:10.1109/JSAC.2004.839390, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 344 - 356, XP011126487 [Y] 11 * abstract * * IV. Evaluation * * IV.B. Bandwidth variability * * IV.C. TRFC Performance with a long duration background traffic * [A] 12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSAC.2004.839390
 [YA]  LOTFALLAH ET AL, "Adaptive bitstream switching of scalable video", SIGNAL PROCESSING. IMAGE COMMUNICATION, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20071101), vol. 22, no. 10, doi:10.1016/J.IMAGE.2007.06.002, ISSN 0923-5965, pages 809 - 832, XP022328281 [Y] 11 * 1. Introduction * * 5. Performance evaluations * [A] 12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.image.2007.06.002
by applicant   P. FALCONIO, P. DINI, "Design and performance evaluation of packet scheduler algorithms for video traffic in the high speed downlink packet access", PROC. IEEE PIMRC, BARCELONA, SPAIN, (200409), doi:doi:10.1109/PIMRC.2004.1368388, pages 2202 - 2206, XP010754414

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PIMRC.2004.1368388
    D. TSE, P. VISWANATH, Fundamentals of Wireless Communication, CAMBRIDGE-UNIVERSITY-PRESS,
    H. WANG, L. KONDI, A. LUTHRA, S. CI, G Wireless Video Communications, JOHN-WILEY-AND-SONS,
    H. WANG, L. KONDI, A. LUTHRA, S. CI, 4G Wireless Video Communications, JOHN-WILEY-AND-SONS,
    "Radio link buffer management and scheduling for wireless video streaming", G. LIEBL, H. JENKAC, T. STOCKHAMMER, C. BUCHNER, Telecommunication Systems, Springer Science & Business Media B. V., vol. 30-1-3, pages 255 - 277,
    M, VAN DER SCHAAR, Y. ANDREOPOULOS, Z. HU, "Optimized scalable video streaming over IEEE 802.11a/e HCCA wireless networks under delay constraints", IEEE TRANS. ON MOBILE COMPUTING, (2006), vol. 5, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1109/TMC.2006.81, pages 755 - 768, XP001546009

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMC.2006.81
    L. CHOI, W. KELLERER, E. STEINBACH, "On cross-layer design for streaming video delivery in multiuser wireless environments", EURASIP JOURNAL ON WIRELESS COMMUNICATION AND NETWORKING, (2006), vol. 2006, pages 1 - 10,
    P. V. PAHALAWATTA, R. BERRY, T. N. PAPPAS, A. K. KATSAGGELOS, "Content-aware resource allocation and packet scheduling for video transmission over wireless networks", IEEE JOURNAL ON SEL. AREAS ON COMMUN., (2007), vol. 25, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1109/JSAC.2007.070511, pages 749 - 759, XP011382005

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSAC.2007.070511
    J. HUANG, Z. LI, M. CHIANG, A. K. KATSAGGELOS, "Joint source adaptation and resource allocation for multi-user wireless video streaming", IEEE TRANS. ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, (2008), vol. 18, no. 5, pages 582 - 595, XP011204597
    M. VAN DER SCHAAR, Y. ANDREOPOULOS, Z. HU, "Optimized video streaming over IEEE 802.11 a/e HCCA wireless networks under delay constraints", IEEE TRANS. ON MOBILE COMPUTING, (2006), vol. 5, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1109/TMC.2006.81, pages 755 - 768, XP001546009

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMC.2006.81
    X. JI, J. HUANG, M. CHIANG, G. LAFRUIT, F. CATTHOOR, "Scheduling and resource allocation for SVC streaming over OFDM downlink systems", IEEE TRANS. ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, (2009), vol. 19, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1109/TCSVT.2009.2026812, pages 1549 - 1555, XP011270123

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2009.2026812
    M. FLURRY ET AL., RESOURCE-AWARE FUZZY LOGIC CONTROL OF VIDEO STREAMING OVER IP AND WIRELESS NETWORKS,
    X. WANG, USING FUZZY LOGIC CONTROLLER TO IMPLEMENT SCALABLE QUALITY ADAPTATION FOR STORED VIDEO IN DIFFSERV NETWORKS,
    S. SETTI, V. KUMAR, N. PRASAD, N. RAJU, "Implementation of fuzzy priority scheduler for MANET and performance analysis with reactive protocols", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ENGINEERING SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (201001), vol. 2, no. 8, pages 3635 - 3640,
    C. L. CHEN, J. W. LEE, S. Y. CHEN, Y. H. KUO, "Hierarchical cross-layer fuzzy control for compromise of multiple objectives in wireless mobile networks", PROC. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MOBILE TECHNOLOGY, APPLICATIONS, AND SYSTEMS (MOBILITY 08, (200809), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1145/1506270.1506304, pages 1 - 7, XP058022631

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1506270.1506304
    J. M. MENDEL, "Fuzzy logic systems for engineering: A tutorial", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, (199503), vol. 83, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/5.364485, pages 345 - 377, XP000497763

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/5.364485
    G. V. DER AUWERA, P. T. DAVID, M. REISSLEIN, L. J. KARAM, "Traffic and quality chacteriza- tion of the H.264/AVC scalable video extension", EURASIP JOURNAL ON ADVANCES IN MULTIMEDIA, (2008), vol. 25, no. 2,
    G. V. DER AUWERA, P. T. DAVID, M. REISSLEIN, L. J. KARAM, "Traffic and quality characterization of the H.264/AVC scalable video extension", EURASIP JOURNAL ON ADVANCES IN MULTIMEDIA, (2008), vol. 25, no. 2,
    SEP. 2006, PHYSICAL LAYER ASPECTS FOR EVOLVED UNIVERSAL TERRESTRIAL RADIO ACCESS (UTRA) (RELEASE 7,
    "Eutra physical channels and modulation (release 8", 3GPP TS 36.211 V8.2.0, (200803),
    S. VAN KESTER SND, T. XIAO, R. E. KOOIJ, K. BRUNNSTRM, O. K. AHMED, "Estimating the impact of single and multiple freezes on video quality", PROC. SPIE CONF. ON HUMAN VISION AND ELECTRONIC IMAGING XVI, vol. 7865,