Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2450828

EP2450828 - Digital-imaging based code symbol reading system having finger-pointing triggered mode of operation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Metrologic Instruments, Inc.
90 Coles Road
Blackwood, NJ 08012 / US
[2012/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Kearney, Sean Philip
HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.,
Patent Services M/S
AB/2B
101 Columbia Road, P. O. Box 2245
Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US
 [2012/19]
Representative(s)Houghton, Mark Phillip , et al
Patent Outsourcing Limited
1 King Street
Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
[2016/33]
Former [2012/19]Buckley, Guy Julian
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell
Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
Application number, filing date11188344.308.11.2011
[2012/19]
Priority number, dateUS2010094215409.11.2010         Original published format: US 942154
[2012/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2450828
Date:09.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2450828
Date:15.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2450828
Date:17.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06K7/10
[2012/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/19]
TitleGerman:Digitalbildgebung basierend auf einem Codesymbol-Lesesystem mit Fingerauslösungsmodus zum Betrieb[2012/19]
English:Digital-imaging based code symbol reading system having finger-pointing triggered mode of operation[2012/19]
French:Lecteur manuel de symboles à code-barres basé sur l'imagerie numérique doté d'une mode de fonctionnement déclenché par pointage du doigt[2012/19]
Examination procedure08.11.2011Examination requested  [2012/19]
16.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
15.06.2016Fee for grant paid
15.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.07.2015
Opposition(s)18.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
06.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.11.2011
AL17.08.2016
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IS17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
TR17.08.2016
IE08.11.2016
MT08.11.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/43]HU08.11.2011
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IS17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
TR17.08.2016
IE08.11.2016
MT08.11.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2018/31]HU08.11.2011
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IS17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
TR17.08.2016
IE08.11.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2018/29]HU08.11.2011
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
TR17.08.2016
IE08.11.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2018/28]HU08.11.2011
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
IE08.11.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/51]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
IE08.11.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/43]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/37]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/35]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/23]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/23]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/13]AT17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/11]AT17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT17.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]US6607134  (BARD SIMON [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 6, line 8 - column 7, line 67; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US6234393  (PARATORE ROBERT M [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 60 - column 5, line 28; figures 1-3 *
by applicantUS2008314985
 US7128266
 US6619549
 US2008283611