Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2418267

EP2418267 - Benefit agent containing delivery particle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.06.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure 
25.10.2019Deletion: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter and Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2012/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Smets, Johan
Bollenberg 79
3210 Lubbeek / BE
02 / Sands, Peggy Dorothy
W5909 Cliff Drive
Appleton, WI 54915 / US
03 / Pintens, An
Kolibriestraat 7
2170 Merksem / BE
04 / Dihora, Jiten Oghavij
4521 Randall Drive
Hamilton, OH 45011 / US
 [2012/07]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/29]Samuels, Lucy Alice
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London
EC2A 2ES / GB
Former [2014/22]Vercruysse, Nicolas
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA
Intellectual Property Department
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Former [2013/38]Pickford, James Lawrence
Procter & Gamble
Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
Former [2012/07]Goodier, Claire-Louise
N.V.Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date11188595.020.11.2007
[2012/07]
Priority number, dateUS20060860645P22.11.2006         Original published format: US 860645 P
US20060861996P30.11.2006         Original published format: US 861996 P
[2012/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2418267
Date:15.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2418267
Date:10.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.2012
ClassificationInternational:C11D17/00, C11D3/50, A61K8/11, A61Q19/00, A61Q5/00, A61Q9/02, A61Q19/10
[2013/01]
Former International [2012/07]C11D17/00, A61K8/11
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/07]
TitleGerman:Pflegemittel mit Freisetzungspartikel[2012/07]
English:Benefit agent containing delivery particle[2012/07]
French:Agent bénéfique contenant une particule d'administration[2012/07]
Examination procedure02.04.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.04.2012Examination requested  [2012/19]
12.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.05.2013Fee for grant paid
29.05.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07862210.7  / EP2087089
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070862210) is  12.11.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.04.2014  15.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 57
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  09.04.2014  15.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER PLC/ UNILEVER N.V.
A company registered in England and Wales under
Company no. 41424 of Unilever House
100 Victoria Embankment/Weena 455
London
Greater London EC4Y 0DY/GB /3013 AL Rotterdam/NL / GB
Opponent's representative
Mewburn Ellis LLP, et al
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
 03  10.04.2014  15.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Im Zollhof 1
67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
 04  10.04.2014  15.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York NY 10022-7499 / US
Opponent's representative
Jenkins, Peter David
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
 05  10.04.2014  24.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Givaudan Schweiz AG
Ueberlandstrasse 138
8600 Duebendorf / CH
Opponent's representative
Simmons, John Murray
Givaudan Schweiz AG Global Patents Überlandstrasse 138
8600 Dübendorf / CH
 06  10.04.2014  24.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Beiersdorf AG
Unnastrasse 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Wilke, Jochen
Beiersdorf AG
Unnastraße 48
Brieffach 79
20253 Hamburg / DE
 07  10.04.2014  24.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Follmann & Co. Gesellschaft für Chemie- Werkstoffe und- Verfahrenstechnik mbH & Co. KG
Karlstrasse 59
32423 Minden / DE
Opponent's representative
von Renesse, Dorothea
König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Mönchenwerther Str. 11
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2019/04]
Former [2015/47]
Opponent(s)01  04.04.2014  15.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 57
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  09.04.2014  15.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER PLC/ UNILEVER N.V.
a company registered in England and Wales under
Company no. 41424 of Unilver House
100 Victoria Embankment/Weena 455
London
Greater London EC4Y 0DY/GB /3013 AL Rotterdam/NL / GB
Opponent's representative
Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
 03  10.04.2014  15.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Im Zollhof 1
67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
 04  10.04.2014  15.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York NY 10022-7499 / US
Opponent's representative
Jenkins, Peter David
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
 05  10.04.2014  24.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Givaudan Schweiz AG
Ueberlandstrasse 138
8600 Duebendorf / CH
Opponent's representative
Simmons, John Murray
Givaudan Schweiz AG Global Patents Überlandstrasse 138
8600 Dübendorf / CH
 06  10.04.2014  24.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Beiersdorf AG
Unnastrasse 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Wilke, Jochen
Beiersdorf AG
Unnastraße 48
Brieffach 79
20253 Hamburg / DE
 07  10.04.2014  24.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Follmann & Co. Gesellschaft für Chemie- Werkstoffe und- Verfahrenstechnik mbH & Co. KG
Karlstrasse 59
32423 Minden / DE
Opponent's representative
von Renesse, Dorothea
König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Mönchenwerther Str. 11
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2014/21]
Opponent(s)01  04.04.2014  15.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 57
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  09.04.2014  15.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER PLC/ UNILEVER N.V.
a company registered in England and Wales under
Company no. 41424 of Unilver House
100 Victoria Embankment/Weena 455
London
Greater London EC4Y 0DY/GB /3013 AL Rotterdam/NL / GB
Opponent's representative
Chisem, Janet
Unilever Patent Group
Colworth House
Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
 03  10.04.2014  15.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Reitstötter - Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Im Zollhof 1
67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
 04  10.04.2014  15.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York NY 10022-7499 / US
Opponent's representative
Jenkins, Peter David
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
 05  10.04.2014   
Givaudan Schweiz AG
Ueberlandstrasse 138
8600 Duebendorf / CH
Opponent's representative
Simmons, John Murray
Givaudan Schweiz AG Global Patents Überlandstrasse 138
8600 Dübendorf / CH
 06  10.04.2014   
Beiersdorf AG
Unnastrasse 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Wilke, Jochen
Beiersdorf AG
Unnastraße 48
Brieffach 79
20253 Hamburg / DE
 07  10.04.2014   
Follmann & Co. Gesellschaft für Chemie- Werkstoffe und- Verfahrenstechnik mbH & Co. KG
Karlstrasse 59
32423 Minden / DE
Opponent's representative
von Renesse, Dorothea
König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Mönchenwerther Str. 11
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2014/20]
Opponent(s)01  04.04.2014   
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 57
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
28.05.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.02.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
19.05.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.05.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition04.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1565/16
29.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
18.10.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
07.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.07.2013
BG10.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
MT10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
GR11.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
IE20.11.2013
LU20.11.2013
[2015/41]
Former [2015/34]AT10.07.2013
BG10.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
GR11.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
IE20.11.2013
LU20.11.2013
Former [2014/48]AT10.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
GR11.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
IE20.11.2013
Former [2014/33]AT10.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
GR11.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/23]AT10.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
GR11.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/22]AT10.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
GR11.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/21]AT10.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
GR11.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/18]AT10.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
GR11.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/12]AT10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
CY14.08.2013
GR11.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/10]AT10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
CY14.08.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/09]AT10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/08]LT10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2013/49]SI10.07.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1589092  (INT FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * examples I-III *;
 [X]EP1588760  (INT FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * examples I,II *;
 [X]WO02074430  (QUEST INT [NL], et al) [X] 1-12 * example -; claims 1,8 *;
 [X]EP1533364  (INT FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * example 3; claim 18 *;
 [X]EP1407753  (INT FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * examples 2,3 *;
 [X]EP1407754  (INT FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * examples 2,3 *;
 [X]EP1533415  (INT FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * example I *;
 [XP]EP1767185  (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1-3,6,11,12 * claims 1,2,15 *;
 [E]EP1894603  (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-3,8,11,12 * examples 1,4,9 *;
 [XP]WO2006131846  (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH], et al) [XP] 1-3,11,12 * examples 2,3 *;
 [XP]GB2429979  (UNILEVER PLC [GB]) [XP] 1-4,8,11,12 * page 10, line 20 - line 35 * * page 14, line 10 - line 13; example - *;
 [AD]US6544926  (BODMER JEROME ROBERT [US], et al) [AD] 1,3-5 * claim 1 *;
 [AD]US2002169233  (SCHWANTES TODD ARLIN [US]) [AD] 1,3-5 * claim 1 *
by applicantUS6869923
 US6592990
 US6544926
 US4515705
 US4537706
 US4537707
 US4550862
 US4561998
 US4597898
 US4968451
 US5565145
 US5929022
 US6294514
 US6376445
 US5576282
 US6306812
 US6326348
 US4430243
 US5597936
 US5595967
 WO0032601
 US6225464
 US5879584
 US5691297
 US5574005
 US5569645
 US5565422
 US5516448
 US5489392
 US5486303
    - ZHANG, Z., SUN, G, "Mechanical Properties of Melamine-Formaldehyde microcapsules", J. MICROENCAPSULATION, (2001), vol. 18, no. 5, pages 593 - 602, XP008139505
    - A. LEO, Comprehensive Medicinal Chemistry, PERGAMON PRESS, (1990), vol. 4, page 295