Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2452839

EP2452839 - Bracket fixture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.04.2015
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Change - applicantpublished on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ACPS Automotive GmbH
Steinbeisstrasse 6
71706 Markgröningen / DE
[2019/41]
Former [2018/02]For all designated states
Bosal ACPS Holding 2 B.V.
Kamerlingh Onnesweg 5
4131 PK Vianen / NL
Former [2015/02]For all designated states
Scambia Holdings Cyprus Limited
17 Gr. Xenopoulou Street
3106 Limassol / CY
Former [2012/20]For all designated states
SCAMBIA Industrial Developments Aktiengesellschaft
In der Ballota 2a
9494 Schaan / LI
Inventor(s)01 / Riehle, Jörg
Lehenstr. 37
71679 Asperg / DE
02 / Gentner, Wolfgang
Ziegeläckerstr. 23
71711 Steinheim / DE
03 / Wegner, Bert
Filsstr. 34
73333 Gingen / DE
04 / Wieczorek, Romeo
Waldackerweg 77/1
73732 Esslingen / DE
 [2012/20]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/20]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date11189371.516.11.2011
[2012/20]
Priority number, dateDE2010104396416.11.2010         Original published format: DE102010043964
[2012/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2452839
Date:16.05.2012
Language:DE
[2012/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2452839
Date:06.05.2015
Language:DE
[2015/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:B60D1/01, B60D1/58
[2012/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/19]
Former [2012/20]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Trägervorrichtung[2012/20]
English:Bracket fixture[2012/20]
French:Dispositif de support[2012/20]
Examination procedure16.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.11.2012Examination requested  [2012/52]
28.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2015Fee for grant paid
24.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.11.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.02.2016   
WESTFALIA - Automotive GmbH
Am Sandberg 45
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Bregenzer und Reule Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Neckarstraße 47
73728 Esslingen / DE
 02  05.02.2016   
Brink Towing Systems B.V.
Industrieweg 5
7951 CX Staphorst / NL
Opponent's representative
Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
 [2016/11]
Former [2016/10]
Opponent(s)01  02.02.2016   
WESTFALIA - Automotive GmbH
Am Sandberg 45
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Bregenzer und Reule Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Neckarstraße 47
73728 Esslingen / DE
11.03.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.09.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
25.09.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.09.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition28.11.2017Appeal received No.  T2514/17
30.01.2018Statement of grounds filed
17.11.2017Appeal received No.  T2514/17
29.01.2018Statement of grounds filed
30.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.11.2011
AL06.05.2015
CY06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MK06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
SM06.05.2015
TR06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
GB16.11.2015
IE16.11.2015
LU16.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
AT16.11.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU16.11.2011
CY06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MK06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
SM06.05.2015
TR06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
GB16.11.2015
IE16.11.2015
LU16.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
AT16.11.2016
Former [2018/10]HU16.11.2011
CY06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
SM06.05.2015
TR06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
GB16.11.2015
IE16.11.2015
LU16.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
AT16.11.2016
Former [2017/38]HU16.11.2011
CY06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
SM06.05.2015
TR06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
GB16.11.2015
IE16.11.2015
LU16.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/47]DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
GB16.11.2015
IE16.11.2015
LU16.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/45]DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
IE16.11.2015
LU16.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/34]DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
LU16.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/31]DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
LU16.11.2015
Former [2016/28]DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/24]DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/21]DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/10]DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/09]DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/07]DK06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2015/50]ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2015/49]ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
PT07.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]US2010076673  (SALOKA GEORGE S [US]) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0010] , [0026] , [0027] * * figure 4 *;
 [XI]US4319766  (CORTEG WALTER V, et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,13,15 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 59 * * figure - * [I] 4;
 [X]DE10154733  (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [X] 1,5-7 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0023] * * figures 1,3 *;
 [X]EP1199547  (DIESSEL MOBILE ELECTRONICS AS [DK]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraphs [0036] , [0048] * * figures 1,5-8 *;
 [X]AU2008264181  (MAUD MICHAEL [AU]) [X] 1,2,13-15 * page 2, line 5 - line 11 * * page 3, line 1 - line 4 * * page 4, line 10 - page 6, line 22 * * figures 1,3-5 *
by applicantEP0799732
 EP1142732