blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2457486

EP2457486 - ROBOT CLEANER AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2012/22]Robot cleaner and control method thereof
[2016/12]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2012/39]
Former [2012/22]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 506-762 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Dong Won
No. 104-2304, Daewoo-Prugio, Seokwoo-dong
Hwaseong-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Lee Jun Hwa
No. 706-1504, Salgugol-7th Apt., Yeongtong-2-dong
Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2012/22]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2016/33]
Former [2012/22]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date11189546.217.11.2011
[2012/22]
Priority number, dateKR2010011733224.11.2010         Original published format: KR 20100117332
[2012/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2457486
Date:30.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2457486
Date:28.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2457486
Date:17.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2013
ClassificationIPC:A47L9/28
[2012/22]
CPC:
A47L9/2826 (EP,KR,US); A47L9/28 (EP,US); A47L9/2805 (EP,US);
A47L9/2831 (EP,KR,US); A47L9/2847 (EP,US); A47L9/2852 (EP,KR,US);
A47L9/2857 (EP,KR,US); G05D1/0274 (EP,US); A47L2201/02 (EP,US);
A47L2201/022 (EP,US); A47L2201/04 (EP,KR,US); A47L2201/06 (EP,US);
G05D1/0227 (EP,US); G05D1/0242 (EP,US); G05D1/0246 (EP,US);
G05D1/0255 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/33]
Former [2012/22]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:REINIGUNGSROBOTER UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2016/12]
English:ROBOT CLEANER AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF[2016/12]
French:NETTOYEUR DE ROBOT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE[2016/12]
Former [2012/22]Reinigungsroboter und Steuerungsverfahren dafür
Former [2012/22]Robot cleaner and control method thereof
Former [2012/22]Nettoyeur de robot et son procédé de commande
Examination procedure27.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/15]
27.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.06.2016Fee for grant paid
30.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.05.2015
Opposition(s)18.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.11.2011
AL17.08.2016
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IS17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
TR17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
IE17.11.2016
MT17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/43]HU17.11.2011
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IS17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
TR17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
IE17.11.2016
MT17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2018/31]HU17.11.2011
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IS17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
TR17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
IE17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2018/29]HU17.11.2011
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
TR17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
IE17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2018/28]HU17.11.2011
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
IE17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/51]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
IE17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/43]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/37]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/35]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/23]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/23]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/13]AT17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/11]AT17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT17.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0527567  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15* page 8, lines 8-25 *;
 [XAYI]DE102004010827  (KAERCHER GMBH & CO KG ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0044] - [0048] * [A] 5-7,12-15 [Y] 3,4,9-11 [I] 8;
 [Y]WO2010051423  (INTELLIBOT ROBOTICS LLC [US], et al) [Y] 3,4,9-11 * paragraph [0022] * * paragraphs [0035] - [0039] *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.