EP2594838 - Arrangement and method for lubricating moving parts in a mechanical device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VBG Group AB (Publ) Box 1216 462 28 Vänersborg / SE | [2013/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thorén, Anders Österäng 400 460 64 Frändefors / SE | 02 /
Andersson, Oscar Vallgatan 24A 462 31 Vänersborg / SE | [2013/21] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/33] | Awapatent AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2013/21] | Edlund, Fabian Awapatent AB Södra Hamngatan 37-41 P.O. Box 11 394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 11189927.4 | 21.11.2011 | [2013/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2594838 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2594838 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16N7/32, F16N7/30 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
F16N7/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/33] |
Former [2013/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Schmieren beweglicher Teile in einer mechanischen Vorrichtung | [2013/21] | English: | Arrangement and method for lubricating moving parts in a mechanical device | [2013/21] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour lubrifier des pièces mobiles dans un dispositif mécanique | [2013/21] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 16.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.11.2011 | AL | 17.08.2016 | CY | 17.08.2016 | EE | 17.08.2016 | ES | 17.08.2016 | HR | 17.08.2016 | IS | 17.08.2016 | LT | 17.08.2016 | LV | 17.08.2016 | MC | 17.08.2016 | MK | 17.08.2016 | RO | 17.08.2016 | RS | 17.08.2016 | SI | 17.08.2016 | SK | 17.08.2016 | SM | 17.08.2016 | TR | 17.08.2016 | BG | 17.11.2016 | MT | 21.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | PT | 19.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 21.11.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
MT | 21.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 21.11.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 21.11.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.11.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | EE | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | EE | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | EE | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 17.08.2016 | |
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 17.08.2016 | |
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 17.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE4208063 (TRINKAUS HANS [DE], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 2, lines 1-50 - column 5, lines 1-11; figure - * [I] 5-8; | [A]DE19915265 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1,9 * abstract *; | [A]DE9112244U (LINK) [A] 1 * page 2 - page 5; figure - *; | [A]GB191315352 (YORK REGINALD STANLEY) [A] 1,9 * page 2; figure - * | by applicant | US3985205 |