Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2574404

EP2574404 - PROCESS FOR DEHULLING OATS WITHOUT REMOVING PLUMULES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2013/14]Process for dehulling oats without removing plumules
[2018/25]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.09.2018
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.05.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL, PT
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Inner Mongolia Sanzhuliang Natural Oats Industry Corporation
19, 15 Qing Nian Road
Kundulun District
Baotou City, Inner Mongolia 014010 / CN
[2013/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Sun, Zhi
19, 15 Qing Nian Road,
Kundulun District
Baotou City
Inner Mongolia 014010 / CN
 [2018/42]
Former [2013/14]01 / Sun, Zhi
19,15 Qing Nian Road, Kundulun District,
Baotou City
014010 Inner Mongolia / CN
Representative(s)Nony
11 rue Saint-Georges
75009 Paris / FR
[2018/42]
Former [2014/21]Tanty, François , et al
Cabinet Nony
3, rue de Penthièvre
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2013/14]Leszczynski, André
Cabinet Nony
3, rue de Penthièvre
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date11191008.928.11.2011
[2013/14]
Priority number, dateWO2011CN8036429.09.2011         Original published format: PCT/CN2011/080364
[2013/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2574404
Date:03.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2574404
Date:05.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2574404
Date:17.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:B02B3/00, B02B3/04
[2017/14]
Former International [2013/14]B02B3/00, B02B3/04, A23L1/10, A23L1/015
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/14]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM SCHÄLEN VON HAFER OHNE ENTFERNUNG DER SPROSSKNOSPEN[2018/25]
English:PROCESS FOR DEHULLING OATS WITHOUT REMOVING PLUMULES[2018/25]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR ÉCOSSER L'AVOINE SANS RETIRER LES GERMES[2018/25]
Former [2013/14]Verfahren zum Schälen von Hafer ohne Entfernung der Sprossknospen
Former [2013/14]Process for dehulling oats without removing plumules
Former [2013/14]Procédé pour écosser de l'avoine sans retirer les plumules
Examination procedure28.11.2011Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.10.2017Examination requested  [2017/46]
28.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.2018Fee for grant paid
04.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.05.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
17.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL17.10.2018
AT17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
[2019/26]
Former [2019/25]AT17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/22]LT17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/21]LT17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
NO17.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
NO17.01.2019
Former [2019/17]NL17.10.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]US4978078  (VADNAY LASZLO [AU]) [X] 1,3-5 * column 4, line 50 - line 51; claim 1 * * column 4, line 35 * [I] 2,6,8;
 [XDI]CN101264459  (ZHI SUN [CN]) [XD] 1-3,5,7 * paragraph [0014]; claims 1, 9 * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018]; figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0050] * * abstract * [I] 4,6,8,9;
 [XI]GB672229  (KARL RUPERT DANIELSSON) [X] 1,3,6 * page 3, column 2, line 72 - line 82; claims 1, 3 * * page 3, column 2, line 96 - line 98; claim 5 * * page 2, column 1, line 16 - line 18 * [I] 2,4,5,8;
 [I]CN101912797  (DAQING RAN) [I] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [I]CN102049326  (HONGFU WANG) [I] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [I]US5702748  (KISHI SOHTAROH [JP], et al) [I] 1-4,6 * column 3, line 42 - line 48; figure 2; claim 4 *
by applicantCN101264459