Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2487561

EP2487561 - Information input apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.06.2015
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2019/19]
Former [2012/33]For all designated states
Sony Mobile Communications Japan, Inc.
1-8-15, Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kusano, Shunichi
c/o Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications Japan, Inc
1-8-15 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo, 108-0075 / JP
 [2012/33]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/33]Jackson, Jonathan Andrew
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date11191360.430.11.2011
[2012/33]
Priority number, dateUS20110442032P11.02.2011         Original published format: US 442032 P
[2012/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2487561
Date:15.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/0488, G06F3/0482, G06F3/023
[2013/39]
Former International [2012/33]G06F3/023, G06F3/048
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Informationseingabevorrichtung[2012/33]
English:Information input apparatus[2012/33]
French:Appareil d'entrée d'informations[2012/33]
Examination procedure19.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/33]
14.02.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.02.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
11.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
11.10.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination09.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0796/17
21.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
28.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.04.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
14.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]US2008098331  (NOVICK GREGORY [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0059] - [0083] - [0099] , [0102] , [0103] , [0150] , [0151] , [0173] - [0180] *;
 [X]US2010100849  (FRAM EVAN K [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 2a-2c,3 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0045] , [0067] , [0069] , [0079] - [0082] *;
 [X]US5790820  (VAYDA MARK [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 3,11,18 * * column 6, line 22 - column 7, line 33 * * column 12, line 37 - column 13, line 23 * * column 16, lines 41-50 * * column 17, lines 5-14 *;
 [X]US2010122194  (ROGERS SEAN S [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 19 * * paragraphs [0019] - [0022] - [0024] , [0026] - [0028] - [0034] *;
 [X]WO03098417  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 4, line 14 - page 6, line 21 *
by applicantJP2006238171