Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2600270

EP2600270 - Identification element-based authentication and identification with decentralised service use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2018Refusal of applicationpublished on 14.02.2018  [2018/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deutsche Telekom AG
Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140
53113 Bonn / DE
For all designated states
Technische Universität Darmstadt
Karolinenplatz 5
64289 Darmstadt / DE
[2013/23]
Inventor(s)01 / Baumöller, Claas
Kennedyallee 35
53175 Bonn / DE
02 / Schaaf, Joachim
Kölner Str. 16a
64293 Darmstadt / DE
03 / Horsch, Moritz
Saalbaustr. 5
64283 Darmstadt / DE
04 / Wiesmaier, Alexander
Fabrikweg 5
63924 Kleinheubach / DE
05 / Braun, Johannes
Im Boden 30
64846 Groß-Zimmern / DE
 [2013/23]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/23]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date11191675.502.12.2011
[2013/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2600270
Date:05.06.2013
Language:DE
[2013/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/00
[2013/23]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Identifikations-Element-basierte Authentisierung und Identifizierung mit verteilter Dienstnutzung[2013/23]
English:Identification element-based authentication and identification with decentralised service use[2013/23]
French:Authentification basée sur un élément d'identification et identification dotée d'une utilisation de service répartie[2013/23]
Examination procedure26.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.10.2012Examination requested  [2013/23]
04.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/07]
12.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
26.09.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
27.09.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/07]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.09.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]DE102008000067  (BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [XI]  - BSI, "Technische Richtlinie eID-Server", Bonn, (20100401), pages 1 - 51, URL: https://www.bsi.bund.de/ContentBSI/Publikationen/TechnischeRichtlinien/tr03130/tr-03130.html, (20110701), XP055001820 [X] 1-3,16,17 * page 7 * * page 14 - page 15 * * page 19 - page 20 * [I] 4-15
 [A]  - Wikipedia, "OpenID", (20111026), Wikipedia.org, URL: http://de.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=OpenID&oldid=95232388, (20120410), XP055024063 [A] 1-17 * the whole document *
 [A]  - Wikipedia, "Identitätsmanagement", (20111122), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://de.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Identit%C3%A4tsmanagement&oldid=96274001, (20120410), XP055024062 [A] 1-17 * the whole document *
 [A]  - Openid.Net, "OpenID Authentication 2.0 - Final", (20071205), pages 1 - 34, URL: http://openid.net/specs/openid-authentication-2_0.html#http_encoding, (20120123), XP055017217 [A] 1-17 * the whole document *
by applicantWO0059244
 DE10262183
 DE10300898
 DE19724901
 DE102007006659
 DE102007037442
 EP2182493
 DE102009001959
 DE102008000067