blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2600270 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2600270



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 146
17.01.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
08.01.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 1
02.10.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
02.10.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
27.09.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
27.09.2017 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
27.09.2017 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
27.09.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 6
27.09.2017 Means of redress Search / examination 2
26.09.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
26.09.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
26.09.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
26.09.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
26.09.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
10.08.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
10.08.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
10.08.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
07.12.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
06.12.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.12.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
05.12.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
05.12.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
29.11.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
12.03.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.01.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
14.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
14.01.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
14.01.2014 Description Search / examination 4
14.01.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
04.09.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
04.09.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.08.2013 Examination started Search / examination 1
10.06.2013 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
08.05.2013 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
26.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
26.10.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
26.10.2012 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
26.10.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
26.10.2012 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 1
26.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.05.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.05.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 4
03.05.2012 European search report Search / examination 3
03.02.2012 Drawings Search / examination 8
03.02.2012 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
23.01.2012 Deficiencies in application documents - annex C Search / examination 3
02.12.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
02.12.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
02.12.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
02.12.2011 Description Search / examination 13
02.12.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.12.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.12.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.12.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.12.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.12.2011 Drawings Search / examination 8
02.12.2011 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4