blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2600270


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.01.2018 Refusal of application published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
26.09.2017 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
25.09.2017 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.12.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
11.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.01.2014 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.01.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.09.2013 First examination report
03.09.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.06.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.06.2013  [2013/23]
03.05.2013 Request for examination filed published on  05.06.2013  [2013/23]
26.10.2012 Amendment by applicant