Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2431036

EP2431036 - Macrocyclic lactone compounds and methods for their use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2018
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Elixir Medical Corporation
920 N. McCarthy Boulevard
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
[2017/13]
Former [2012/12]For all designated states
Elixir Medical Corporation
870 Hermosa Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Yan, John
102 Worcester Lane
Los Gatos, CA California 95030 / US
02 / Zheng, Xiaoxia
642 Mercy Street A
Mountain View, CA California 94041 / US
03 / Bhat, Vinayak D.
10156 Carol Lee Drive
Cupertino, CA California / US
 [2012/12]
Representative(s)Hamer, Christopher K. , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2017/15]
Former [2012/12]Zvesper, Thomas
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
Greater London EC1N 2SQ / GB
Application number, filing date11191788.612.09.2007
[2012/12]
Priority number, dateUS20060825531P13.09.2006         Original published format: US 825531 P
[2012/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2431036
Date:21.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2431036
Date:12.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/436, A61F2/00, A61K9/00, A61K31/453, A61K31/787, A61P9/00, A61K47/00, A61L27/34, A61L27/54, A61L29/08, A61L31/10, A61L31/16, A61L29/16, A61L31/00, A61F2/90, A61F2/92
[2012/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/15]
Former [2012/12]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesAL21.09.2012
BA21.09.2012
HR21.09.2012
MK21.09.2012
RS21.09.2012
TitleGerman:Makrocyclische Lactonverbindungen und Verfahren zu deren Verwendung[2012/12]
English:Macrocyclic lactone compounds and methods for their use[2012/12]
French:Composés de lactone macrocyclique et procédés pour leur utilisation[2012/12]
Examination procedure21.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.09.2012Examination requested  [2012/44]
07.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.10.2015
20.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.2015Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
30.12.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
09.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
22.09.2016Fee for grant paid
22.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
03.10.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
31.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07842371.2  / EP2083834
Divisional application(s)EP13181253.9  / EP2702993
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070842371) is  11.08.2011
Opposition(s)15.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/12]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
22.09.2016Request for further processing filed
22.09.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.10.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
02.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
02.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
25.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
IE12.09.2017
LU12.09.2017
MT12.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/39]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
IE12.09.2017
LU12.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
Former [2018/34]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
IE12.09.2017
LU12.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
Former [2018/29]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/25]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL12.04.2017
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9316189  (PFIZER [US]) [X] 9-12,14-15 * abstract * * page 1, lines 12-13 * * page 9; compounds N929-89B * * page 10, lines 8-15; table 2 * * claims 1-10 * [Y] 1-15;
 [XY]WO9402136  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 9-12,14-15 * abstract * * page 1, lines 7-12 * * page 129, lines 15-16; compound 18 * * page 13, line 13 - page 14, line 9 * * page 14, line 9 - page 20, line 19 * * pages 21-22; examples a-h * * claims 19,20,22-23 * [Y] 1-15;
 [XY]WO9412655  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 9-12,14-15 * abstract * * page 1, lines 17-20 * * page 6, lines 1-35 * * page 12, lines 10-30 * [Y] 1-15;
 [XY]WO9606847  (PFIZER [US], et al) [X] 9-12,14-15 * abstract * * page 2; compound II * * page 6, line 12 - page 7, line 16 * * page 7, line 21 - page 10, line 31 * * claims 1-4 * [Y] 1-15;
 [Y]US2002005206  (FALOTICO ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * claims 1-15 *;
 [Y]US2006094744  (MARYANOFF CYNTHIA A [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] * * claims 1-19 *;
 [Y]EP1588727  (CORDIS CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0014] - [0017] - [0024] - [0051] * * claims 1-4 *;
 [Y]WO0187375  (CORDIS CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, lines 15-19 * * page 14, lines 24-26 * * page 14, line 18 - page 16, line 10 * * page 10, line 4 - page 14, line 2 * * claims 1-24 *;
 [Y]US2003099712  (JAYARAMAN SWAMINATHAN [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * claims 1-20 *;
 [XY]  - NISHIDA H ET AL, "GENERATION OF NOVEL RAPAMYCIN STRUCTURES BY MICROBIAL MANIPULATIONS", JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, JAPAN ANTIBIOTICS RESEARCH ASSOCIATION, TOKYO, JP, (19950101), vol. 48, no. 7, ISSN 0021-8820, pages 657 - 666, XP008042923 [X] 9-12,14-15 * abstract * * page 658; compounds CJ-12,263 * * page 660; table 3 * [Y] 1-15
 [A]  - MARKS A R, "Rapamycin: signaling in vascular smooth muscle", TRANSPLANTATION PROCEEDINGS, ELSEVIER INC, ORLANDO, FL; US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0041-1345(03)00243-4, (20030501), vol. 35, no. 3 Suppl, ISSN 0041-1345, pages 231S - 233S, XP002537983 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/s0041-1345(03)00243-4
Examination   - S. R. Edwards ET AL, "The Rapamycin-binding Domain of the Protein Kinase Mammalian Target of Rapamycin Is a Destabilizing Domain", Journal of Biological Chemistry, (20070101), vol. 282, no. 18, doi:10.1074/jbc.M700498200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 13395 - 13401, XP055048190

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M700498200
    - Diane C Fingar ET AL, "Target of rapamycin (TOR): an integrator of nutrient and growth factor signals and coordinator of cell growth and cell cycle progression", Oncogene, (20040419), vol. 23, no. 18, doi:10.1038/sj.onc.1207542, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 3151 - 3171, XP055048182

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1207542
    - P. Cai ET AL, "In Vitro Metabolic Study of Temsirolimus: Preparation, Isolation, and Identification of the Metabolites", Drug Metabolism and Disposition, (20070101), vol. 35, no. 9, doi:10.1124/dmd.107.014746, ISSN 0090-9556, pages 1554 - 1563, XP055048204

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/dmd.107.014746
    - Y. Onuma ET AL, "MAHOROBA, first-in-man study: 6-month results of a biodegradable polymer sustained release tacrolimus-eluting stent in de novo coronary stenoses", European Heart Journal, (20090602), vol. 30, no. 12, doi:10.1093/eurheartj/ehp127, ISSN 0195-668X, pages 1477 - 1485, XP055048205

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/eurheartj/ehp127
    - VIGNOT S ET AL, "mTOR-targeted therapy of cancer with rapamycin derivatives", ANNALS OF ONCOLOGY, KLUWER, DORDRECHT, NL, vol. 16, no. 4, doi:10.1093/ANNONC/MDI113, ISSN 0923-7534, (20050401), pages 525 - 537, (20050222), XP008145753

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/annonc/mdi113
    - GRINFELD A A ET AL, "ACID CATALYZED FUNCTIONALIZATION OF RAPAMYCIN", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19940101), vol. 35, no. 37, doi:10.1016/0040-4039(94)85017-8, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 6835 - 6838, XP000651235

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4039(94)85017-8
    - LUENGO J I ET AL, "STRUCTURE-ACTIVITY STUDIES OF RAPAMYCIN ANALOGS: EVIDENCE THAT THE C-7 METHOXY GROUP IS PART OF THE EFFECTOR DOMAIN AND POSITIONED AT THE FKBP12-FRAP INTERFACE", CHEMISTRY AND BIOLOGY, CURRENT BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (19950101), vol. 2, no. 7, doi:10.1016/1074-5521(95)90264-3, ISSN 1074-5521, pages 471 - 481, XP002045681

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/1074-5521(95)90264-3
    - KUHNT M ET AL, "MICROBIAL CONVERSION OF RAPAMYCIN", ENZYME AND MICROBIAL TECHNOLOGY, STONEHAM, MA, US, (19971101), vol. 21, doi:10.1016/S0141-0229(97)00013-6, ISSN 0141-0229, pages 405 - 412, XP000995900

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0141-0229(97)00013-6
    - POON M ET AL, "Rapamycin inhibits vascular smooth muscle cell migration.", THE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION 15 NOV 1996, (19961115), vol. 98, no. 10, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 2277 - 2283,
    - LEUNG LOUIS Y ET AL, "Pharmacokinetics and metabolic disposition of sirolimus in healthy male volunteers after a single oral dose", THERAPEUTIC DRUG MONITORING, (200602), vol. 28, no. 1, ISSN 0163-4356, pages 51 - 61,
by applicantUS3929992
 US3993749
 US5078999
 US5080899
 US5321009
 US5286730
 US5286731
 US5288711
 US5516781
 EP0525960
 US5387589
 US5206018
 US5496832
 US5561138
 US4650803
 US4316885
 US5151413
 US5120842
 US5362718
 US5665772
 US5258389
 US6384046
 WO9735575
    - PARKER, E. M. ET AL., NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, (2000), vol. 39, pages 1913 - 1919,
    - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1985),
    - LIEBERMAN, PHARMACEUTICAL DOSAGE FORMS, (1992), vol. 1-3,
    - LLOYD, THE ART, SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY OFPHARMACEUTICAL COMPOUNDING, (1999),
    - PICKAR, DOSAGE CALCULATIONS, (1999),
    - Remington: The Science and Practice of Pharmacy, LIPPINCOTT, WILLIAMS & WILKINS, (2003),
    - Handbook of Pharmaceutical Excipients, AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION, (1986),
    - "Importance of Monocyte Chemoattractant Protein- Pathway in Neointimal Hyperplasia After Periarterial Injury in Mice and Monkeys", CIRC RES., (2002), vol. 90, pages 1167 - 1172,
    - "Expression of Monocyte Chemoattractant Protein 1 in Macrophage-Rich Areas of Human and Rabbit Atherosclerotic Lesions", PNAS, vol. 88, pages 5252 - 5256,
    - "Interleukin-10 Inhibits Intimal Hyperplasia After Angioplasty or Stent Implantation in Hypercholesterolemic Rabbits", CIRCULATION., (2000), vol. 101, pages 908 - 9L6,
    - JOURNAL OFANTIBIOTICS, (1991), vol. 44, no. 6, page 688,
    - SCHWARTZ ET AL., CIRCULATION., (2002), vol. 106, pages 1867 - 1873,
    - "Elevated matrix metalloproteinase expression after stent implantation is associated with restenosis", INT J CARDIOL., (2006), vol. 112, no. 1, pages 85 - 90,
    - SOUSA, JE, CIRCULATION, (2001), vol. 103, pages 192 - 195,