Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2466291

EP2466291 - Cuvette for photometric measurement of small liquid volumes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2014
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
For:DE 
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
[2012/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Oosterbroek, Edwin
Gartenstrasse 7
6330 Cham / CH
02 / Drechsler, Andreas
Frueebergstrasse 53
6340 Baar / CH
 [2012/25]
Representative(s)Curcio, Mario , et al
Roche Diagnostics International AG
Patents
Forrenstrasse 2
6343 Rotkreuz / CH
[2013/14]
Former [2012/33]Poredda, Andreas , et al
Roche Diagnostics International Ltd
Patents
Forrenstrasse 2
6343 Rotkreuz / CH
Former [2012/25]Poredda, Andreas
Roche Diagnostics Ltd.
Patents (DSP)
Forrenstrasse
6343 Rotkreuz / CH
Application number, filing date11192461.907.12.2011
[2012/25]
Priority number, dateEP2010019522515.12.2010         Original published format: EP 10195225
[2012/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2466291
Date:20.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2466291
Date:11.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2012
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/03
[2012/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/25]
TitleGerman:Küvette zur fotometrischen Messung kleiner Flüssigkeitsmengen[2012/25]
English:Cuvette for photometric measurement of small liquid volumes[2012/25]
French:Cuvette pour la mesure photométrique de petits volumes de liquide[2012/25]
Examination procedure29.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.12.2012Examination requested  [2013/07]
12.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2013Fee for grant paid
24.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.04.2013
Opposition(s)12.06.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/34]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.12.2011
AL11.09.2013
AT11.09.2013
BE11.09.2013
BG11.09.2013
CY11.09.2013
CZ11.09.2013
DK11.09.2013
EE11.09.2013
ES11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
HR11.09.2013
IT11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
MC11.09.2013
MK11.09.2013
MT11.09.2013
NL11.09.2013
PL11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
SK11.09.2013
SM11.09.2013
TR11.09.2013
IE07.12.2013
LU07.12.2013
NO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
GR12.12.2013
IS11.01.2014
PT13.01.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2015/41]HU07.12.2011
AT11.09.2013
BE11.09.2013
BG11.09.2013
CY11.09.2013
CZ11.09.2013
DK11.09.2013
EE11.09.2013
ES11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
HR11.09.2013
IT11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
MC11.09.2013
MK11.09.2013
MT11.09.2013
NL11.09.2013
PL11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
SK11.09.2013
SM11.09.2013
TR11.09.2013
IE07.12.2013
LU07.12.2013
NO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
GR12.12.2013
IS11.01.2014
PT13.01.2014
Former [2015/34]HU07.12.2011
AT11.09.2013
BE11.09.2013
BG11.09.2013
CY11.09.2013
CZ11.09.2013
DK11.09.2013
EE11.09.2013
ES11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
HR11.09.2013
IT11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
MC11.09.2013
MK11.09.2013
NL11.09.2013
PL11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
SK11.09.2013
SM11.09.2013
TR11.09.2013
IE07.12.2013
LU07.12.2013
NO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
GR12.12.2013
IS11.01.2014
PT13.01.2014
Former [2015/32]AT11.09.2013
BE11.09.2013
CY11.09.2013
CZ11.09.2013
DK11.09.2013
EE11.09.2013
ES11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
HR11.09.2013
IT11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
MC11.09.2013
MK11.09.2013
NL11.09.2013
PL11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
SK11.09.2013
SM11.09.2013
TR11.09.2013
IE07.12.2013
LU07.12.2013
NO11.12.2013
GR12.12.2013
IS11.01.2014
PT13.01.2014
Former [2015/31]AT11.09.2013
BE11.09.2013
CY11.09.2013
CZ11.09.2013
DK11.09.2013
EE11.09.2013
ES11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
HR11.09.2013
IT11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
MC11.09.2013
NL11.09.2013
PL11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
SK11.09.2013
SM11.09.2013
IE07.12.2013
LU07.12.2013
NO11.12.2013
GR12.12.2013
IS11.01.2014
PT13.01.2014
Former [2015/21]AT11.09.2013
BE11.09.2013
CY11.09.2013
CZ11.09.2013
DK11.09.2013
EE11.09.2013
ES11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
HR11.09.2013
IT11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
MC11.09.2013
NL11.09.2013
PL11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
SK11.09.2013
IE07.12.2013
LU07.12.2013
NO11.12.2013
GR12.12.2013
IS11.01.2014
PT13.01.2014
Former [2014/48]AT11.09.2013
BE11.09.2013
CY11.09.2013
CZ11.09.2013
DK11.09.2013
EE11.09.2013
ES11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
HR11.09.2013
IT11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
NL11.09.2013
PL11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
SK11.09.2013
IE07.12.2013
LU07.12.2013
NO11.12.2013
GR12.12.2013
IS11.01.2014
PT13.01.2014
Former [2014/41]AT11.09.2013
BE11.09.2013
CY11.09.2013
CZ11.09.2013
DK11.09.2013
EE11.09.2013
ES11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
HR11.09.2013
IT11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
NL11.09.2013
PL11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
SK11.09.2013
LU07.12.2013
NO11.12.2013
GR12.12.2013
IS11.01.2014
PT13.01.2014
Former [2014/38]AT11.09.2013
BE11.09.2013
CY11.09.2013
CZ11.09.2013
EE11.09.2013
ES11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
HR11.09.2013
IT11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
NL11.09.2013
PL11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
SK11.09.2013
LU07.12.2013
NO11.12.2013
GR12.12.2013
IS11.01.2014
PT13.01.2014
Former [2014/28]AT11.09.2013
BE11.09.2013
CY11.09.2013
CZ11.09.2013
EE11.09.2013
ES11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
HR11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
NL11.09.2013
PL11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
SK11.09.2013
NO11.12.2013
GR12.12.2013
IS11.01.2014
PT13.01.2014
Former [2014/24]AT11.09.2013
BE11.09.2013
CY11.09.2013
CZ11.09.2013
EE11.09.2013
ES11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
HR11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
NL11.09.2013
PL11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
SK11.09.2013
NO11.12.2013
GR12.12.2013
IS11.01.2014
Former [2014/23]BE11.09.2013
CY11.09.2013
CZ11.09.2013
EE11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
HR11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
NL11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
SK11.09.2013
NO11.12.2013
GR12.12.2013
IS11.01.2014
Former [2014/22]BE11.09.2013
CY11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
HR11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
NL11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
NO11.12.2013
GR12.12.2013
Former [2014/18]BE11.09.2013
CY11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
HR11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
NO11.12.2013
GR12.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY28.08.2013
FI11.09.2013
HR11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
NO11.12.2013
GR12.12.2013
Former [2014/10]CY28.08.2013
HR11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
NO11.12.2013
Former [2014/09]HR11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
NO11.12.2013
Former [2014/08]LT11.09.2013
NO11.12.2013
Former [2014/07]NO11.12.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1898202  (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14 * abstract; paragraphs [0004] - [0008] - [0038] - [0052]; figures 1-4,6,14 *