Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2429241

EP2429241 - Circuit switched fallback in evolved packet system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.04.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
02.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2012/11]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Mildh, Gunnar
Turebergs Allé 7
191 62 Sollentuna / SE
 [2012/11]
Representative(s)Ericsson
Patent Development
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2013/19]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2012/11]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date11192773.713.05.2009
[2012/11]
Priority number, dateUS200861054387P19.05.2008         Original published format: US 200861054387 P
[2012/21]
Former [2012/11]US20080054387P19.05.2008
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2429241
Date:14.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2429241
Date:08.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04W36/14, // H04W36/12
[2012/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/11]
TitleGerman:Leistungsgesteuerter Fallback in einem entwickelten Paketsystem[2012/11]
English:Circuit switched fallback in evolved packet system[2012/11]
French:Rechange commutée de circuit dans un système de paquet évolué[2012/11]
Examination procedure30.08.2012Examination requested  [2012/41]
26.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.2013Fee for grant paid
15.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09750876.6  / EP2277342
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.02.2014  14.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
 [2015/23]
Former [2014/12]
Opponent(s)01  07.02.2014   
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
Opponent's representative
Lippich, Wolfgang
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
14.03.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.08.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
27.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.11.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition26.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0175/16
29.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
18.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
MK08.05.2013
MT08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
TR08.05.2013
IE13.05.2013
LU13.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]CY08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
MK08.05.2013
MT08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
TR08.05.2013
IE13.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2015/13]CY08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
MT08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
IE13.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/20]CY08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
IE13.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/14]CY08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/11]CY08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/09]CY08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/02]CY08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/52]CY08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/51]FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/50]FI08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/49]FI08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/48]LT08.05.2013
NO08.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT08.05.2013
NO08.08.2013
PT09.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0176273  (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 10, line 8 - page 13, line 29; figure 4 *;
 [A]WO2008023162  (VODAFONE PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract *;
 [A]  - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project;Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects;Circuit Switched Fallback in Evolved Packet System; Stage 2(Release 8)", 3GPP DRAFT; 23272-110_REV, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080415), vol. SA WG2, no. Prague; 20080512, XP050265398 [A] 1-16 * page 15, paragraph 6.4 - page 20, paragraph 7.4 *
 [A]  - ERICSSON, "General cleanups and alignments of CS Fallback", 3GPP DRAFT; S2-084149_CSFB_23272-110_CLEANUPS_REV_OF_3281, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080514), vol. SA WG2, no. Prague; 20080512, XP050266289 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [T]  - ERICSSON, "RAN2 functionality for CS fallback", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-082928_RAN2_IMPACTS_OF_CSFALLBACK, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080601), vol. RAN WG2, no. Sophia Antipolis, France; 20080605, XP050142121 [T] 1-16 * the whole document *