Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2465691

EP2465691 - Improvements relating to laser marking [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.04.2017
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
11.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siltech Limited
Unit 4, Heathcoat Building Nottingham Science&Technology Park Nottingham
Nottinghamshire NG7 2QJ / GB
[2012/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Khan, Nazir
c/o SILTECH LIMITED
Unit 4, Heathcoat Building
Nottingham Science & Technology Park
Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG7 2QJ / GB
 [2012/25]
Representative(s)Adamson Jones
BioCity Nottingham
Pennyfoot Street
Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/25]Adamson Jones
BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham
Nottinghamshire NG1 1GF / GB
Application number, filing date11193971.618.12.2007
[2012/25]
Priority number, dateGB2006002518619.12.2006         Original published format: GB 0625186
GB2006002518719.12.2006         Original published format: GB 0625187
GB2006002518819.12.2006         Original published format: GB 0625188
[2012/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2465691
Date:20.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2465691
Date:26.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:B41M5/26, C08K5/17, C08K3/22, C08K3/24, C09D131/04, C09D131/00
[2013/43]
Former International [2012/25]B41M5/26, C08K3/22, C08K5/17, C09D131/00, C09D131/04, C09D133/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/25]
TitleGerman:Verbesserungen im Zusammenhang mit Lasermarkierung[2012/25]
English:Improvements relating to laser marking[2012/25]
French:Améliorations portant sur le marquage au laser[2012/25]
Examination procedure20.12.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.12.2012Examination requested  [2013/10]
26.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.09.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.02.2014Fee for grant paid
11.02.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07848725.3  / EP2121821
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070848725) is  07.12.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.12.2014   
Ferro Corporation
6060 Parkland Boulevard
Mayfield Heights, OH 44134 / US
Opponent's representative
Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2015/07]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
04.02.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.08.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.02.2017Date of oral proceedings
10.04.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.04.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition20.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1446/17
21.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
25.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.12.2007
AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
MC26.03.2014
MT26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
TR26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
GR27.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
IE18.12.2014
LU18.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU18.12.2007
AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
MC26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
TR26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
GR27.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
IE18.12.2014
LU18.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/28]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
MC26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
GR27.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
IE18.12.2014
LU18.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/27]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
MC26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
IE18.12.2014
LU18.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/47]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
IE18.12.2014
LU18.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/46]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
IE18.12.2014
LU18.12.2014
Former [2015/36]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
LU18.12.2014
Former [2015/35]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
LU18.12.2014
Former [2015/18]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
Former [2015/08]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
Former [2015/02]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
Former [2014/51]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
Former [2014/50]BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
Former [2014/49]BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
Former [2014/48]BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
Former [2014/47]BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
Former [2014/46]BE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
Former [2014/41]FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
Former [2014/37]FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
Former [2014/36]LT26.03.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]US2005032957  (KHAN NAZIR [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * examples 3, 4, 17, 19 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] *;
 [X]WO2005068207  (SHERWOOD TECHNOLOGY LTG [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 1, line 31 - page 2, line 7 * * page 2, line 28 - line 33 * * page 12, line 8 - page 14, line 34 * * claims 1-11 *;
 [X]US2005269304  (KHAN NAZIR [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0039] * * claims 1-26 *
by applicantWO0078554