EP2587440 - Banking system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Change - priority | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tata Consultancy Services Limited Nirmal Building 9th Floor Nariman Point Mumbai 400 021 Maharashtra / IN | [2013/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Agarwal, Rahul Tata Consultancy Services Ltd 362-363, Udgyog Vihar, Phase-IV 122001 Gurgaon / IN | 02 /
Goel, Vipin Tata Consultancy Services Ltd 362-363, Udgyog Vihar, Phase-IV 122001 Gurgaon / IN | [2013/18] | Representative(s) | Danner, Stefan, et al LifeTech IP Spies Danner & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Elsenheimerstrasse 47a 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Danner, Stefan, et al LifeTech IP Spies Danner & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Sankt-Martin-Strasse 53-55 81669 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/18] | Danner, Stefan, et al DR. VOLKER VOSSIUS Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Partnerschaft Geibelstraße 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11194357.7 | 19.12.2011 | [2013/18] | Priority number, date | IN2011MUM3030 | 25.10.2011 Original published format: IN 3030MU2011 | [2017/16] |
Former [2013/18] | IN2011MUM3030 | 25.10.2011 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2587440 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q40/02 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
G06Q40/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bankensystem | [2013/18] | English: | Banking system | [2013/18] | French: | Système de banque | [2013/18] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2011 | Examination requested [2013/18] | 05.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/18] | 10.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - EPO, "Mitteilung des Europäischen Patentamts vom 1. Oktober 2007 über Geschäftsmethoden = Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods = Communiqué de l'Office européen des brevets,en date du 1er octobre 2007, concernant les méthodes dans le domaine des activités", JOURNAL OFFICIEL DE L'OFFICE EUROPEEN DES BREVETS.OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE.AMTSBLATTT DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS, OEB, MUNCHEN, DE, (20071101), vol. 30, no. 11, ISSN 0170-9291, pages 592 - 593, XP007905525 [L] 1-15 * Statement in accordance with the Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods (OJ 11/2007; p592f) The claimed subject matter, with due regard to the description and drawings, relates to processes comprised in the list of subject matter and activities excluded from patentability under Art.52(2) and (3) EPC. The applicant is advised that in accordance with the established practice of the EPO, no search need be performed in respect of those aspects of the claimed invention. The only identifiable technical aspects of the claimed invention relate to the use of conventional, general-purpose data processing technology for processing data of an inherently non-technical nature. The information technology employed is considered to have been generally known as it was widely available to everyone at the date of filing/priority of the present application. The notoriety of such prior art cannot reasonably be contested. No documentary evidence was therefore considered required. * |