blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2469204

EP2469204 - A cooling device with a reinforced inner liner and production method for it [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2012/26]A cooling device with a reinforced inner liner and the production method thereof
[2018/17]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.04.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip31.01.2024Change: Despatch of interlocutory decision 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BSH Hausgeräte GmbH
Carl-Wery-Strasse 34
81739 München / DE
[2015/13]
Former [2012/26]For all designated states
BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH
Carl-Wery-Strasse 34
81739 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Asaroglu, Emin Hikmet
Kazimiye Mah. Barbaros Cad. No:39
59850 Corlu / TR
02 / Cinici, Bilal
Fevzipasa Mh. Güvenis Mh. No:75 D:10 Cerkezköy
59501 Tekirdag / TR
03 / Kara, Caner
Muhittin Mh. Acun Sk. No:4 D:7 Corlu
59850 Tekirdag / TR
 [2012/26]
Representative(s)(deleted)
[2012/26]
Application number, filing date11194455.920.12.2011
[2012/26]
Priority number, dateTR2010001084224.12.2010         Original published format: TR 201010842
[2012/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2469204
Date:27.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2469204
Date:15.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2469204
Date:29.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.12.2013
ClassificationIPC:F25D23/06, B29C49/54, B29C51/06, B29C51/10
[2014/03]
CPC:
F25D23/066 (EP); B29C49/54 (EP); B29C2791/001 (EP);
B29C2791/006 (EP); B29C51/06 (EP); B29C51/10 (EP);
B29L2031/7622 (EP); F25D23/064 (EP); F25D23/067 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2012/26]F25D23/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/35]
Former [2012/26]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kühlvorrichtung mit verstärkter Innenauskleidung und Herstellungsverfahren dafür[2012/26]
English:A cooling device with a reinforced inner liner and production method for it[2018/17]
French:Dispositif de refroidissement avec revêtement interne renforcé et procédé de production associé[2012/26]
Former [2012/26]A cooling device with a reinforced inner liner and the production method thereof
Examination procedure15.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/34]
14.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2018Fee for grant paid
18.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.02.2017
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.05.2019  04.06.2019  ADMISSIBLE
LOUIS PÖHLAU LOHRENTZ Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Merianstraße 26
90409 Nürnberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
 [2023/35]
Former [2019/28]
Opponent(s)01  29.05.2019  04.06.2019  ADMISSIBLE
Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz
Merianstr. 26
90409 Nürnberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
12.06.2019Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.08.2019Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.07.2020Date of oral proceedings
08.09.2020Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.02.2024Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition06.11.2020Appeal received No.  T1927/20
06.11.2020Payment of appeal fee
05.01.2021Statement of grounds filed
23.11.2023Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
22.12.2023Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
21.10.2020Appeal received No.  T1927/20
20.10.2020Payment of appeal fee
15.12.2020Statement of grounds filed
23.11.2023Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
22.12.2023Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
23.11.2023Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.12.2011
AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CY29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
MC29.08.2018
MK29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PT29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
GB20.12.2018
IE20.12.2018
LU20.12.2018
MT20.12.2018
IS29.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
[2020/31]
Former [2020/30]HU20.12.2011
AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
MC29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PT29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
GB20.12.2018
IE20.12.2018
LU20.12.2018
MT20.12.2018
IS29.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
Former [2020/27]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
MC29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PT29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
GB20.12.2018
IE20.12.2018
LU20.12.2018
MT20.12.2018
IS29.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
Former [2020/08]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
MC29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
GB20.12.2018
IE20.12.2018
LU20.12.2018
MT20.12.2018
IS29.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
Former [2020/04]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
MC29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
GB20.12.2018
IE20.12.2018
LU20.12.2018
IS29.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
Former [2020/03]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
MC29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
GB20.12.2018
IE20.12.2018
LU20.12.2018
IS29.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
Former [2019/51]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
MC29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IE20.12.2018
LU20.12.2018
IS29.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
Former [2019/49]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
MC29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IE20.12.2018
LU20.12.2018
IS29.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
Former [2019/48]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
MC29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IE20.12.2018
LU20.12.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/40]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
MC29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
LU20.12.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/39]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
LU20.12.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/37]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/23]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
NO29.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NO29.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT29.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1038145  (FISHER & PAYKEL [NZ]) [Y] 7 * paragraphs [0023] , [0 24] *;
 [XYI]US6574984  (MCCREA MICHAEL JAMES [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * paragraph [0021] * [Y] 7 [I] 3,4;
 [XP]US2010326122  (SEO WOON KYU [KR], et al) [XP] 1,5,6* figures 1, 2 *
OppositionFR68736E
 US5599081
 KR19990032111U
 KR20010060723
 EP1744114
 KR20100022742
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.