Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2441475

EP2441475 - Reduced temperature sterilization of stents [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.11.2016
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Abbott Cardiovascular Systems Inc.
3200 Lakeside Drive
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2012/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Huang, Bin
1996 Paseo del Cajón
Pleasanton, CA California 94566 / US
02 / Freeman, Abigail
423 Anza Street
Fremont, CA California 94539 / US
03 / Castro, Daniel
271 Woodhams Road
Santa Clara, CA California 95051 / US
04 / Gale, David C.
962 Kinghorn Drive NW
Kennesaw
GA 30152 / US
 [2014/07]
Former [2013/04]01 / Huang, Bin
1996 Paseo del Cajón
Pleasanton, CA California 94566 / US
02 / Freeman, Abigail
423 Anza Street
Fremont, CA California 94539 / US
03 / Castro, Daniel
108 Bryant Street Apartment 26
Mountain View, CA California 94041 / US
04 / Gale, David C.
962 Kinghorn Drive NW
Kennesaw
GA 30152 / US
Former [2012/16]01 / Huang, Bin
1996 Paseo del Cajón
Pleasanton, CA California 94566 / US
02 / Freeman, Abigail
423 Anza Street
Fremont, CA California 94539 / US
03 / Castro, Daniel
108 Bryant Street Apartment 26
Mountain View, CA California 94041 / US
04 / Gale, David C.
3276 Amherst Lane
San José, CA California 95117 / US
Representative(s)de Rooij, Mathieu Julien , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg S.L.
Avenida Diagonal 420, 1° 1ª
08037 Barcelona / ES
[N/P]
Former [2012/16]ZBM Patents
Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1
08002 Barcelona / ES
Application number, filing date11195520.911.07.2007
[2012/16]
Priority number, dateUS2006048669013.07.2006         Original published format: US 486690
[2012/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2441475
Date:18.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2441475
Date:12.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61L2/08, A61F2/06, B65B55/02
[2012/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/16]
TitleGerman:Stentsterilisierung bei reduzierter Temperatur[2012/16]
English:Reduced temperature sterilization of stents[2012/16]
French:Stérilisation de température réduire d'endoprothèses[2012/16]
Examination procedure17.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.10.2012Examination requested  [2012/48]
23.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.2013Fee for grant paid
01.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07810386.8  / EP2061521
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070810386) is  28.12.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.11.2014   
Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew
Graham Watt & Co LLP
St Botolph's House
7-9 St Botolph's Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
Opponent's representative
Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew
Graham Watt & Co. LLP
St. Botolph's House
7-9 St. Botolph's Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
 [2014/52]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
23.12.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.06.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
28.11.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.11.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition27.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0296/17
31.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
19.12.2019Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
20.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
10.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
08.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.07.2007
AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
BG12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
MC12.02.2014
MT12.02.2014
PL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
SI12.02.2014
SK12.02.2014
TR12.02.2014
GR13.05.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
LU11.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU11.07.2007
AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
BG12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
MC12.02.2014
MT12.02.2014
PL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
SI12.02.2014
SK12.02.2014
GR13.05.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
LU11.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/28]AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
BG12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
MC12.02.2014
MT12.02.2014
PL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
SI12.02.2014
SK12.02.2014
GR13.05.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
LU11.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/25]AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
BG12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
MC12.02.2014
PL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
SI12.02.2014
SK12.02.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
LU11.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/21]AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
MC12.02.2014
PL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
SI12.02.2014
SK12.02.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
LU11.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/24]AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
PL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
SI12.02.2014
SK12.02.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
LU11.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/20]AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
PL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
SK12.02.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
LU11.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/13]AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
PL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
SK12.02.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
LU11.07.2014
Former [2014/50]AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
PL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
SK12.02.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
Former [2014/49]AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
Former [2014/48]AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
Former [2014/42]AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
Former [2014/41]AT12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
Former [2014/37]AT12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT12.02.2014
IS12.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]US2005118344  (PACETTI STEPHEN D [US]) [A] 1,4,5 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0026] - [0038] - [0048] , [0053] , [0065] , [0096] , [0128] *;
 [A]US2005003007  (BOIX MICHELE [FR] ET AL) [A] 1,3-5 * paragraphs [0007] , [0016] , [0019] - [0023] - [0038] *;
 [A]EP0424159  (OSTEOTECH INC [US]) [A] 1,11 * column 2, line 14 - column 4, line 5 *;
 [A]EP1520795  (CODMAN & SHURTLEFF [US]) [A] 1,4,5,7,8 * paragraphs [0010] , [0015] , [0020] , [0027] *;
 [A]US6355215  (POGGIE ROBERT [US] ET AL) [A] 1,4,6,7 * column 3, line 61 - column 6, line 31 *