Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2436275

EP2436275 - Lipid composition for improving brain function [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.06.2013
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
20.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
N.V. Nutricia
Eerste Stationsstraat 186
2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL
[N/P]
Former [2012/14]For all designated states
N.V. Nutricia
Eerste Stationsstraat 186
2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Hageman, Robert Johan Joseph
Hamsterlaan 12
6705 CT Wageningen / NL
02 / van der Beek, Eline Marleen
Reeboklaan 10
6705 DB Wageningen / NL
03 / Groenendijk, Martine
Mazurkastraat 50
2992 GP Barendrecht / NL
04 / Kamphuis, Patrick Joseph Gerardus Hendrikus
Park Arenberg 55
3731 EP de Bilt / NL
 [2012/21]
Former [2012/14]01 / Hageman, Robert Johan Joseph
Hamsterlaan 12
6705 CT Wageningen / NL
02 / van der Beek, Eline Marleen
Reeboklaan 10
6705 DB Wageningen / NL
03 / Groenendijk, Martine
Mazurkastraat 50
2992 GP Barendrecht / NL
04 / Kamphuis, Patrick Joseph Gerardus Hendrikus
Adriaen van Ostadelaan 118
3583 AM Utrecht / NL
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2013/28]
Former [2012/14]Hutter, Jacobus Johannes
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
J.W. Frisolaan 13
2517 JS The Hague / NL
Application number, filing date11195555.520.06.2008
[2012/14]
Priority number, dateWO2007NL5030626.06.2007         Original published format: PCT/NL2007/050306
[2012/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2436275
Date:04.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2436275
Date:24.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.03.2012
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/29, A23L1/30, A61K31/00, A23L2/52, A61K31/19, A61K31/201, A61K31/202
[2012/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/14]
TitleGerman:Lipidzusammensetzung zur Verbesserung der Gehirnfunktion[2012/14]
English:Lipid composition for improving brain function[2012/14]
French:Composition de lipides pour améliorer la fonction cérébrale[2012/14]
Examination procedure23.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/14]
29.10.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
30.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.05.2013Fee for grant paid
27.05.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08766833.1  / EP2162019
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.04.2014  30.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Stasse 1
61352 Bad-Homburg v.d.H. / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
 02  17.04.2014  30.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park IL 60064 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant LLP, et al
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
 03  24.04.2014  30.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Société des Produits Nestlé S.A.
Entre-deux-Villes
1800 Vevey / CH
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2019/34]
Opponent(s)01  15.04.2014  30.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Stasse 1
61352 Bad-Homburg v.d.H. / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
 02  17.04.2014  30.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park IL 60064 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant LLP, et al
5th Floor, Salisbury Square House
8, Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
 03  24.04.2014  30.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Société des Produits Nestlé S.A.
Entre-deux-Villes
1800 Vevey / CH
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2018/51]
Opponent(s)01  15.04.2014  30.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Stasse 1
61352 Bad-Homburg v.d.H. / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
 02  17.04.2014  30.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park IL 60064 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant LLP, et al
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
 03  24.04.2014  30.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Opponent's representative
Elkington & Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2015/27]
Opponent(s)01  15.04.2014  30.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Stasse 1
61352 Bad-Homburg v.d.H. / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
 02  17.04.2014  30.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park IL 60064 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant, et al
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
 03  24.04.2014  30.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Opponent's representative
Kingsbury, Oliver William
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2014/23]
Opponent(s)01  15.04.2014  30.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Stasse 1
61352 Bad-Homburg v.d.H. / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
 02  17.04.2014  30.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Abbott Laboratories
100 Abbott Park Rd.
Abbott Park, IL 60064 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant, et al
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
 03  24.04.2014  30.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Opponent's representative
Oldroyd, Richard Duncan
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2014/22]
Opponent(s)01  15.04.2014   
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Stasse 1
61352 Bad-Homburg v.d.H. / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
 02  17.04.2014   
Abbott Laboratories
100 Abbott Park Rd.
Abbott Park, IL 60064 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant, et al
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
06.06.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.09.2015Date of oral proceedings
01.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.12.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition25.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0240/16
11.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
26.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application
07.11.2012Request for further processing filed
07.11.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.11.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.06.2008
BG24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
MT24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
NO24.10.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
IE20.06.2014
LU20.06.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2016/25]BG24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
MT24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
NO24.10.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
IE20.06.2014
LU20.06.2014
Former [2016/16]CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
MT24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
NO24.10.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
IE20.06.2014
LU20.06.2014
Former [2015/21]CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
NO24.10.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
IE20.06.2014
LU20.06.2014
Former [2015/09]CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
NO24.10.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
LU20.06.2014
Former [2014/23]CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
NO24.10.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
Former [2014/22]CY24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
NO24.10.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
Former [2014/18]CY24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
NO24.10.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
Former [2014/12]FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
CY21.08.2013
NO24.10.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
Former [2014/10]HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
CY21.08.2013
NO24.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
Former [2014/09]HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
NO24.10.2013
Former [2014/08]LT24.07.2013
NO24.10.2013
Former [2014/07]NO24.10.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]US2004001817  (GIAMPAPA VINCENT C [US]) [A] 1-18 * figure 4; claims 1-30 *;
 [A]  - ASAI H ET AL, "Food compsn. for malfunctional disease e.g. Alzheimer's - contg. protein and fat contg. eicosa:penta:enoic or docosa: hexa:enoic acid", WPI/THOMSON,, (19940830), vol. 1994, no. 39, XP002494932 [A] 1-18 * abstract *
 [A]  - IDOTA T ET AL, "Powder milk for infant contg. high fatty acid with unsatd. bonds - contains e.g. eicosa pentanoic acid and docosa hexanoic acid", WPI / THOMSON, (19890327), XP002449815 [A] 1-18 * abstract *