30.01.2024 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
15.01.2024 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
15.01.2024 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
17.11.2023 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
12.02.2021 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
06.07.2020 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
14.03.2020 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
20.09.2019 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
20.09.2019 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
19.07.2019 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
16.11.2018 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
11.04.2016 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal |
|
18.03.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] |
05.02.2016 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
30.01.2016 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
30.01.2016 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
30.11.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
30.11.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked |
|
29.05.2015 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] |
17.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
20.03.2015 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
23.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
10.10.2014 |
Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
06.06.2014 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
02.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
02.05.2014 |
Opposition filed |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
25.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
25.04.2014 |
Opposition filed |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
28.03.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] |
14.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
10.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
21.06.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] |
07.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.06.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] |
03.06.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.06.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
29.01.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.12.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] |
07.12.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] |
20.11.2012 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
14.11.2012 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
14.11.2012 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
29.10.2012 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
21.04.2012 |
Change - inventor |
published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] |
13.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.04.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] |
02.03.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] |
29.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|