Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2481910

EP2481910 - Fuel injector component [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.07.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
19.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Robert Bosch GmbH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2012/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Buerkle, Frieder
Hauptstr. 75
73349 Wiesensteig / DE
02 / Ellenschlaeger, Andreas
Brenzstr. 19
70374 Stuttgart / DE
 [2012/31]
Application number, filing date11196257.730.12.2011
[2012/31]
Priority number, dateDE2011100345201.02.2011         Original published format: DE102011003452
[2012/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2481910
Date:01.08.2012
Language:DE
[2012/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2481910
Date:28.08.2013
Language:DE
[2013/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:F02M51/06, F02M61/16, F02M63/00
[2012/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/31]
TitleGerman:Kraftstoffeinspritzkomponente[2012/31]
English:Fuel injector component[2012/31]
French:Composant d'injection de carburant[2012/31]
Examination procedure20.12.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.02.2013Examination requested  [2013/11]
14.05.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2013Fee for grant paid
12.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.05.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.05.2014  04.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
MAN Diesel & Turbo SE
Stadtbachstrasse 1
86153 Augsburg / DE
 [2014/32]
Former [2014/28]
Opponent(s)01  28.05.2014  04.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
MAN Diesel & Turbo SE
86153 Augsburg / DE
03.07.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.01.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
16.08.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.08.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition06.10.2016Appeal received No.  T2328/16
23.12.2016Statement of grounds filed
18.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.12.2011
AL28.08.2013
BG28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
ES28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
IT28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
MK28.08.2013
MT28.08.2013
NL28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
SM28.08.2013
TR28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
RS28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
IE30.12.2013
LU30.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
BE31.12.2013
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
GB30.12.2015
AT30.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/24]HU30.12.2011
BG28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
ES28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
IT28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
MK28.08.2013
MT28.08.2013
NL28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
SM28.08.2013
TR28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
RS28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
IE30.12.2013
LU30.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
BE31.12.2013
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
GB30.12.2015
AT30.12.2016
Former [2016/47]HU30.12.2011
BG28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
ES28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
IT28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
MK28.08.2013
MT28.08.2013
NL28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
SM28.08.2013
TR28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
RS28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
IE30.12.2013
LU30.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
BE31.12.2013
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
GB30.12.2015
Former [2016/32]HU30.12.2011
BG28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
ES28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
IT28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
MK28.08.2013
MT28.08.2013
NL28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
SM28.08.2013
TR28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
RS28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
IE30.12.2013
LU30.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
BE31.12.2013
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/47]HU30.12.2011
BG28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
ES28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
IT28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
MK28.08.2013
MT28.08.2013
NL28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
SM28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
RS28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
IE30.12.2013
LU30.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
BE31.12.2013
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/41]HU30.12.2011
BG28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
ES28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
IT28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
MK28.08.2013
MT28.08.2013
NL28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
SM28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
RS28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
IE30.12.2013
LU30.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
BE31.12.2013
Former [2015/34]HU30.12.2011
BG28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
ES28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
IT28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
MK28.08.2013
NL28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
SM28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
RS28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
IE30.12.2013
LU30.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
BE31.12.2013
Former [2015/33]CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
ES28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
IT28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
MK28.08.2013
NL28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
SM28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
IE30.12.2013
LU30.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
BE31.12.2013
Former [2015/25]CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
ES28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
IT28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
NL28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
SM28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
IE30.12.2013
LU30.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
BE31.12.2013
Former [2015/21]CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
ES28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
IT28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
NL28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
IE30.12.2013
LU30.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
BE31.12.2013
Former [2014/48]CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
ES28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
IT28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
NL28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
IE30.12.2013
LU30.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
BE31.12.2013
Former [2014/46]CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
ES28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
IT28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
NL28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
LU30.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
BE31.12.2013
Former [2014/38]CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
ES28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
IT28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
NL28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
LU30.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/24]CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
ES28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
IT28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
NL28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/23]CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
NL28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/22]CY28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
NL28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/21]CY28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/18]CY28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/12]FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
CY04.09.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/11]FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
CY04.09.2013
NO28.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/10]HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
CY04.09.2013
NO28.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/09]HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/08]LT28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/07]NO28.11.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1653076  (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,10 * paragraphs [0084] - [0089]; figures 11a-c *
by applicantDE102007025964