Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2365725

EP2365725 - Cellular wireless LAN with frequency division multiplex in TV white space [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.10.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Disney Enterprises, Inc.
500 South Buena Vista Street
Burbank, CA 91521 / US
[2011/39]
Former [2011/37]For all designated states
Mangold, Stefan
500 S. Buena Vista St.
Burbank, CA 91512 / US
For all designated states
Aiello, Roberto
500 S. Buena Vista St.
Burbank, CA 91512 / US
For all designated states
Gross, Thomas
500 S. Buena Vista St.
Burbank, CA 91512 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mangold, Stefan
c/o Disney Enterprise, Inc.
500 S. Buena Vista St.
Burbank CA 91512 / US
02 / Aiello, Roberto
c/o Disney Enterprise, Inc.
500 S. Buena Vista St.
Burbank CA 91512 / US
03 / Gross, Thomas
c/o Disney Enterprise, Inc.
500 S. Buena Vista St.
Burbank CA 91512 / US
04 / Gross, Markus
c/o Disney Enterprise, Inc.
500 S. Buena Vista St.
Burbank CA 91512 / US
 [2013/47]
Former [2011/37]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Round, Edward Mark
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/19]Round, Edward Mark
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2012/21]Round, Edward Mark
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2011/37]Collins, John David
Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date11250300.814.03.2011
[2011/37]
Priority number, dateUS20100313683P12.03.2010         Original published format: US 313683 P
US20100415323P18.11.2010         Original published format: US 415323 P
US2011004526810.03.2011         Original published format: US 45268
[2011/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2365725
Date:14.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2365725
Date:02.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2365725
Date:09.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.11.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04L5/00, H04W74/08, H04B1/04, H04B1/10, H04W16/14, // H04W24/00, H04W28/04, H04W84/12, H04W84/18, H04L5/14
[2017/40]
Former International [2013/01]H04W74/08, H04L12/413, H04L5/00, H04L27/00
Former International [2011/37]H04W74/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/19]
Former [2011/37]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Zellulares drahtloses lokales Netzwerk mit Frequenzmultiplexen in TV-White-Space[2011/37]
English:Cellular wireless LAN with frequency division multiplex in TV white space[2011/37]
French:LAN sans fil cellulaire doté d'un multiplexage par répartition de la fréquence dans un espace TV blanc[2011/37]
Examination procedure01.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/33]
02.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2018Fee for grant paid
14.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.03.2015
Opposition(s)12.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
29.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL09.05.2018
AT09.05.2018
CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
IT09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
MC09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
SI09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
[2019/51]
Former [2019/46]AT09.05.2018
CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
IT09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
MC09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
SI09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AT09.05.2018
CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
IT09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
SI09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT09.05.2018
CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
IT09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT09.05.2018
CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2018/52]ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2018/51]ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
Former [2018/50]ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
Former [2018/49]ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
Former [2018/47]ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
NO09.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[XDI]  - Lars Berlemann ET AL, "Cognitive Radio and Dynamic Spectrum Access", Cognitive Radio and Dynamic Spectrum Access, Wiley, (20090701), pages 145 - 187, ISBN 978-0-47-075443-6, XP055044614 [XD] 1-7,10-15 * page 145 - page 149; figure 6.1 * [I] 8,9
 [I]  - GUMMALLA A C V ET AL, "An access protocol for a wireless home network", WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE, 1999. WCNC. 1999 IE EE NEW ORLEANS, LA, USA 21-24 SEPT. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990921), doi:10.1109/WCNC.1999.796966, ISBN 978-0-7803-5668-9, pages 1392 - 1396, XP010353704 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * sections III-IV *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WCNC.1999.796966
 [XP]  - STEFAN MANGOLD (DISNEY RESEARCH), "carrier-grade 802.11 operating in paired spectrum ; 11-10-0533-01-0wng-carrier-grade-802-11-operating-in-paired-spectrum", IEEE DRAFT; 11-10-0533-01-0WNG-CARRIER-GRADE-802-11-OPERATING-IN-PAIRED-SPECTRUM, IEEE-SA MENTOR, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20100516), vol. 802.11WNG SC, no. 1, pages 1 - 18, XP017677010 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [T]  - STEFAN MANGOLD ET AL, "A dual-radio contention-based protocol for paired spectrum access and TV white space", WIRELESS ON-DEMAND NETWORK SYSTEMS AND SERVICES (WONS), 2012 9TH ANNUAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20120109), doi:10.1109/WONS.2012.6152214, ISBN 978-1-4577-1721-5, pages 107 - 112, XP032115771

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WONS.2012.6152214
by applicant   - G. BIANCHI, "Performance analysis of the ieee 802.11 distributed coordination function", SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE JOURNAL, (200003), vol. 18, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/49.840210, pages 535 - 547, XP011449989

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.840210