Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2383434

EP2383434 - High pitch-to-chord turbine airfoils [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
09.10.2019Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
For all designated states
MTU Aero Engines AG
Dachauer Strasse 665
80995 München / DE
[2018/52]
Former [2016/43]For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
Former [2011/44]For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
United Technologies Building One Financial Plaza
Hartford, CT 06101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Praisner, Thomas J.
236 Bull Hill Road
Colchester, CT 06415 / US
02 / Estes, Matthew B.
110 Farmstead Drive
South Windsor, CT 06074 / US
03 / Jurek, Renee J.
60 Pleasant Street
Colchester, CT 06415 / US
04 / Huebner, Norbert
Hochstrasse 25
85221 Dachau / DE
 [2016/03]
Former [2011/44]01 / Praisner, Thomas J.
236 Bull Hill Road
Colchester, CT 06415 / US
02 / Estes, Matthew B.
110 Farmstead Drive
South Windsor, CT 06074 / US
03 / Jurek, Renee J.
60 Pleasant Street
Colchester, CT 06415 / US
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/44]Hall, Matthew Benjamin
Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date11250416.201.04.2011
[2011/44]
Priority number, dateUS2010076882228.04.2010         Original published format: US 768822
[2011/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2383434
Date:02.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2383434
Date:19.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:F01D5/14
[2011/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Turbinenschaufel mit hohem Verhältnis von Turbinensteigung zur Sehnenlänge[2011/44]
English:High pitch-to-chord turbine airfoils[2011/44]
French:Aube de turbine avec un grand rapport pas / corde[2011/44]
Examination procedure19.12.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.12.2013Examination requested  [2014/06]
08.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.06.2018
26.06.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
14.09.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination23.11.2018Appeal received No.  T0865/19
24.01.2019Statement of grounds filed
12.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.12.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
25.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
25.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
25.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
18.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[I]EP0937862  (BMW ROLLS ROYCE GMBH [DE] ROLLS ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [I] 1-5 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0009] - [0012] - [0037] - [0042] * * figures 1,2 *;
 [I]US5352092  (FERLEGER JUREK [US] ET AL) [I] 1-4 * columns 3-5 * * figures 1,2,5 *