blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2506442

EP2506442 - Radio head device and method of operating a radio head device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  30.09.2020
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2020Revocation of patentpublished on 04.11.2020  [2020/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
Site Nokia Paris Saclay
Route de Villejust
91620 Nozay / FR
[2018/16]
Former [2014/34]For all designated states
ALCATEL LUCENT
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Former [2013/21]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
3, avenue Octave Gréard
75007 Paris / FR
Former [2012/40]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
3, avenue Octave Gréard
75007 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Wiegner, Dirk
Rosenstrasse 22
71409 Schwaikheim / DE
 [2012/40]
Representative(s)Nokia EPO representatives
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
[N/P]
Former [2013/01]Wetzel, Emmanuelle, et al
Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG
Intellectual Property & Standards
70430 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2012/40]Schäfer, Wolfgang, et al
Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date11290161.631.03.2011
[2012/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2506442
Date:03.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2506442
Date:22.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.2011
ClassificationIPC:H04B1/04, H03G3/30, H04B1/18
[2012/40]
CPC:
H04B1/04 (EP); H03G3/3042 (EP); H03G3/3084 (EP);
H04B1/18 (EP); H04B2001/0491 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/40]
TitleGerman:Funkkopfvorrichtung und Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Funkkopfvorrichtung[2012/40]
English:Radio head device and method of operating a radio head device[2012/40]
French:Dispositif de tête de radio et son procédé de fonctionnement[2012/40]
Examination procedure18.01.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.01.2012Examination requested  [2012/40]
06.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.02.2013Fee for grant paid
13.02.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.03.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.02.2014  27.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Kathrein-Werke KG
Anton-Kathrein-Str. 1-3
83004 Rosenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Harrison, Robert John
Sonnenberg Harrison Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 33 08 65
80068 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/14]
Opponent(s)01  24.02.2014  27.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Kathrein-Werke KG
Anton-Kathrein-Str. 1-3
83004 Rosenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Harrison, Robert John
24IP Law Group Sonnenberg Fortmann Herzogspitalstraße 10a
80331 München / DE
01.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.07.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
13.01.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.01.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.09.2020Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
20.09.2020Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/45]
Appeal following opposition15.03.2016Appeal received No.  T0681/16
13.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
04.09.2020Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:01
For:all designated states
Date:10.04.2013
[2013/40]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.03.2011
AL22.05.2013
AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CY22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
MK22.05.2013
MT22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
RS22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
SM22.05.2013
TR22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
CH31.03.2014
IE31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
LU31.03.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU31.03.2011
AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CY22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
MK22.05.2013
MT22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
RS22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
SM22.05.2013
TR22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
CH31.03.2014
IE31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
LU31.03.2014
Former [2016/33]HU31.03.2011
AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CY22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
MT22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
RS22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
SM22.05.2013
TR22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
CH31.03.2014
IE31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
LU31.03.2014
Former [2016/32]HU31.03.2011
AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CY22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
MT22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
RS22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
SM22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
CH31.03.2014
IE31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
LU31.03.2014
Former [2016/31]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CY22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
MT22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
RS22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
SM22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
CH31.03.2014
IE31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
LU31.03.2014
Former [2016/27]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
MT22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
RS22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
SM22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
CH31.03.2014
IE31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
LU31.03.2014
Former [2016/22]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MT22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
RS22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
SM22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
CH31.03.2014
IE31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
LU31.03.2014
Former [2016/12]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MT22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
RS22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
CH31.03.2014
IE31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
LU31.03.2014
Former [2015/08]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
RS22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
CH31.03.2014
IE31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
LU31.03.2014
Former [2015/07]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
RS22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
IE31.03.2014
LU31.03.2014
Former [2014/48]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
RS22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
LU31.03.2014
Former [2014/14]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
RS22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/11]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
RS22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/10]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RS22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RS22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/06]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RS22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/02]AT22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RS22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/51]AT22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RS22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/50]AT22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RS22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
NO22.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT22.05.2013
NO22.08.2013
PT23.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010151898  (LEE ILGU [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * the whole document * [I] 4,7;
 [A]US2003020558  (TIIHONEN MARKKU J [FI], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2005085194  (ROBINSON IAN [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2007087776  (TERADA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.