Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2568749

EP2568749 - Method of providing communication over a mobile communication network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.10.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
Site Nokia Paris Saclay
Route de Villejust
91620 Nozay / FR
[2018/16]
Former [2018/05]For all designated states
ALCATEL LUCENT
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Former [2014/34]For all designated states
ALCATEL LUCENT
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Former [2013/11]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
3, avenue Octave Gréard
75007 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Bakker, Hajo
Alemanenstraße 30-1
71735 Eberdingen / DE
02 / Doetsch, Uwe
Rotenbergstrasse 43
74392 Freudental / DE
03 / Klein, Siegfried
Steiermärker Strasse 104
70469 Stuttgart / DE
04 / Weber, Andreas
Lauchaecker 3
74251 Lehrensteinsfeld / DE
 [2013/11]
Representative(s)Browne, Robin Forsythe , et al
Hepworth Browne
15 St Paul's Street
Leeds LS1 2JG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/05]Wetzel, Emmanuelle
Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG
Intellectual Property Business Group
70430 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2013/11]Zinsinger, Norbert
Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz
P.O. Box 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date11290397.606.09.2011
[2013/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2568749
Date:13.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2568749
Date:31.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04W36/00, // H04W24/02, H04W88/00, H04W36/24
[2017/40]
Former International [2013/11]H04W48/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/05]
Former [2013/11]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Bereitstellung von Kommunikation über ein mobiles Kommunikationsnetzwerk[2013/11]
English:Method of providing communication over a mobile communication network[2013/11]
French:Procédé pour la fourniture de communication dans un réseau de communication mobile[2013/11]
Examination procedure31.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.08.2012Examination requested  [2013/11]
23.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2017Fee for grant paid
19.12.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.12.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.03.2017
Opposition(s)02.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
22.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Executiondeleted
[2014/47]
Former [2013/40]ID:01
For:all designated states
Date:10.04.2013
[2014/47]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
GB06.09.2018
IE06.09.2018
LU06.09.2018
MT06.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
FR30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/47]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
GB06.09.2018
IE06.09.2018
LU06.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
FR30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
Former [2019/40]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
IE06.09.2018
LU06.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
FR30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
Former [2019/38]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
IE06.09.2018
LU06.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
FR30.09.2018
Former [2019/33]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
IE06.09.2018
LU06.09.2018
Former [2019/30]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
LU06.09.2018
Former [2019/24]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2019/13]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/38]AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/37]ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
Former [2018/36]ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
Former [2018/35]FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]US2010103845  (ULUPINAR FATIH [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-13 * * paragraphs [0007] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0056] - [0070] * * paragraphs [0080] - [0083] *;
 [X]WO2011023234  (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-8 * * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 10 * * page 16, line 13 - page 19, line 27 *;
 [X]US2010020710  (GUPTA RAJARSHI [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-8 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0009] * * paragraphs [0052] - [0054] - [0068] *;
 [A]US2009129291  (GUPTA RAJARSHI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-8,13 * * paragraphs [0035] , [0040] , [0045] * * paragraphs [0049] , [0050] , [0059] * * paragraphs [0060] , [0073] , [0080] * * paragraph [0103] *
 [A]  - ERICSSON, "Neighbour Relations and X2 Self-configuration for Relay Nodes", 3GPP DRAFT; R3-102200, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100815), vol. RAN WG3, no. Madrid, Spain; 20100823, XP050453076 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *