Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2384082 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 247
21.06.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
17.08.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.07.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
04.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.07.2016 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
04.07.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.07.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
04.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.03.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
08.03.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
08.03.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
08.03.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 50
25.01.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
27.01.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.01.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.11.2011 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
06.10.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
06.10.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
08.09.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.09.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 1
08.09.2011 European search report Search / examination 1
27.08.2011 (Partial) description filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 5
27.08.2011 Drawings Search / examination 9
27.08.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
17.08.2011 (Partial) description filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 5
17.08.2011 Drawings Search / examination 9
17.08.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
17.08.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
17.08.2011 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 4
17.06.2011 Deficiencies in application documents - annex B and C Search / examination 4
28.05.2011 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
28.05.2011 Priority document Search / examination 56
28.04.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.04.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
28.04.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
28.04.2011 Description Search / examination 38
28.04.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.04.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.04.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.04.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.04.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.04.2011 Drawings Search / examination 9
28.04.2011 Priority search results Search / examination 1
28.04.2011 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5