Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2384082


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
28.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.08.2017  [2017/35]
21.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.08.2017  [2017/34]
07.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.08.2017  [2017/32]
23.06.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  26.07.2017  [2017/30]
21.04.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.05.2017  [2017/21]
07.04.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
24.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
10.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
27.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
15.07.2016 (Expected) grant published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
08.07.2016 Change - representative
08.07.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
08.07.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
05.07.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
04.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.03.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.02.2016 Change - classification published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
05.02.2016 Change - classification published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
05.02.2016 Change - German title published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
05.02.2016 Change - English title published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
05.02.2016 Change - French title published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
31.03.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.03.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.03.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.02.2012 Request for examination filed published on  07.03.2012  [2012/10]
23.11.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.11.2011  [2011/44]