Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2384082
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014098708Global Dossier 10.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201113097125 29.04.2011
US201314100746 09.12.2013
FR1001869 30.04.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2012022831Global Dossier 26.01.2012A1
Priority number Date
FR1001869 30.04.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2384082Global Dossier 17.08.2016B1
EP2384082 02.11.2011A1
Priority number Date
FR1001869 30.04.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FR2959637 27.04.2012B1
FR2959637 04.11.2011A1
Priority number Date
FR1001869 30.04.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
IL212561 30.11.2015A
IL212561D 31.07.2011D0
Priority number Date
FR1001869 30.04.2010