Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2462832

EP2462832 - Epilator with a precision head [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2012/24]Epilator with a precision head
[2014/34]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.12.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.2019New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SEB S.A.
112 Chemin du Moulin Carron
Campus SEB
69130 Ecully / FR
[2016/41]
Former [2012/24]For all designated states
SEB S.A.
Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois
69130 Ecully / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Fabron, Jérôme
1779 Route des Petits Potaches
38780 SEPTEME / FR
02 / Pollet, Cédric
6 Lotissement Brossuras
38690 CHABONS / FR
03 / Henin, Laurent
32 rue de la Favorite
69005 LYON / FR
 [2012/24]
Representative(s)Poindron, Cyrille
Novagraaf International SA
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [2015/02]Guéry-Jacques, Géraldine , et al
SEB Développement
Service Propriété Industrielle
Les 4 M -
Chemin du Petit Bois - B.P. 172
69134 Écully Cedex / FR
Former [2012/24]Guéry-Jacques, Géraldine , et al
SEB Développement Service Propriété Industrielle Les 4 M - Chemin du Petit Bois - B.P. 172
69134 Ecully Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date11306617.906.12.2011
[2012/24]
Priority number, dateFR2010006026108.12.2010         Original published format: FR 1060261
[2012/24]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2462832
Date:13.06.2012
Language:FR
[2012/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2462832
Date:07.01.2015
Language:FR
[2015/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:A45D26/00
[2012/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/24]
TitleGerman:Enthaarungsgerät mit präzisionskopf[2014/35]
English:Epilator with a precision head[2014/35]
French:Epilateur avec tête de précision[2012/24]
Former [2012/24]Enthaarungsgerät mit Präzisionskopf
Former [2012/24]Epilator with a precision head
Examination procedure10.12.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.12.2012Examination requested  [2013/03]
31.07.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.11.2014Fee for grant paid
27.11.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.11.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.07.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.10.2015  12.10.2015  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2018/51]
Opponent(s)01  07.10.2015  12.10.2015  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Elkington & Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2015/46]
Opponent(s)01  07.10.2015   
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Anderson, James Edward George
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
13.11.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.05.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.10.2017Date of oral proceedings
07.12.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.12.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition16.02.2018Appeal received No.  T0527/18
16.04.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL07.01.2015
AT07.01.2015
CY07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
MK07.01.2015
MT07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SI07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
SM07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
GB06.12.2015
IE06.12.2015
LU06.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
CZ06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
HU07.12.2017
PT06.06.2018
GR05.07.2018
[2019/22]
Former [2018/52]AL07.01.2015
AT07.01.2015
CY07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
MK07.01.2015
MT07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SI07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
SM07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
GB06.12.2015
IE06.12.2015
LU06.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
CZ06.12.2017
HU07.12.2017
PT06.06.2018
GR05.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL07.01.2015
AT07.01.2015
CY07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
MK07.01.2015
MT07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SI07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
SM07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
GB06.12.2015
IE06.12.2015
LU06.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
CZ06.12.2017
HU07.12.2017
PT06.06.2018
Former [2018/46]AL07.01.2015
AT07.01.2015
CY07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
MK07.01.2015
MT07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SI07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
SM07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
GB06.12.2015
IE06.12.2015
LU06.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
CZ06.12.2017
PT06.06.2018
Former [2018/36]AT07.01.2015
CY07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
MK07.01.2015
MT07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SI07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
SM07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
GB06.12.2015
IE06.12.2015
LU06.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
CZ06.12.2017
PT06.06.2018
Former [2018/31]AT07.01.2015
CY07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
MK07.01.2015
MT07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SI07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
SM07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
GB06.12.2015
IE06.12.2015
LU06.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2017/38]AT07.01.2015
CY07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
MT07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SI07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
SM07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
GB06.12.2015
IE06.12.2015
LU06.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2016/47]AT07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SI07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
GB06.12.2015
IE06.12.2015
LU06.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2016/46]AT07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SI07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
IE06.12.2015
LU06.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2016/45]AT07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SI07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
IE06.12.2015
LU06.12.2015
Former [2016/34]AT07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SI07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
LU06.12.2015
Former [2016/33]AT07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SI07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
Former [2016/12]AT07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SI07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
Former [2015/49]AT07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
Former [2015/39]AT07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
Former [2015/38]AT07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
Former [2015/36]FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
Former [2015/35]LT07.01.2015
NO07.04.2015
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE20021185U  (SEB SA [FR]) [X] 1-3,12 * page 9, paragraph 1 - page 11, paragraph 3; figures 1-4 * [I] 6-11;
 [XI]WO2010023629  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 10, line 13 - page 11, line 25; figures 3-5,19-24 * * page 16, line 22 - page 18, line 4 * [I] 12;
 [A]EP1386559  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0033] - [0043]; figures 17-28 *;
 [A]WO2009104124  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,2,7,8,12 * page 4, line 26 - page 9, line 1; figures 1a-5b *;
 [A]WO0132049  (SEB SA [FR], et al) [A] 1 * page 9, line 16 - page 12, line 14; figures 1a-6 * * page 13, lines 6-9 * * page 14, lines 1-6 *
by applicantFR2668902
 FR2926962
 EP1884174
 EP1024726