blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2443951

EP2443951 - Multiple use anatomic sandal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.04.2014
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.04.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.05.2014  [2014/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tsinividis, Leonidas
1 Nikiforou Theotoki Street
116 36 Athens / GR
[2012/17]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2012/17]
Representative(s)(deleted)
[2012/17]
Application number, filing date11386020.924.10.2011
[2012/17]
Priority number, dateGR2010010061022.10.2010         Original published format: GR 2010100610
[2012/17]
Filing languageEL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2443951
Date:25.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2443951
Date:10.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.03.2013
ClassificationIPC:A43B7/14, A43B3/10, A43B13/04, A43B3/24
[2013/15]
CPC:
A43B7/141 (EP); A43B13/04 (EP); A43B3/103 (EP);
A43B3/105 (EP); A43B3/108 (EP)
Former IPC [2012/17]A43B7/14, A43B3/10, A43B13/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/17]
TitleGerman:Anatomische Mehrzwecksandale[2012/17]
English:Multiple use anatomic sandal[2012/17]
French:Sandale anatomique polyvalente[2012/17]
Examination procedure11.10.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/19]
27.11.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2014/19]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201303   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO0013537  (THATCHER MARK [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 11, line 2 - line 4; figure 5 * [I] 3,6;
 [X]WO0182734  (DARCO INTERNAT [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0022]; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US6874254  (SILVERA ALBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1,2* paragraph [0017]; figure 1 *;
 [X]US2008110057  (EADES JOHN MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0029]; figure 2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.